This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/09/2021 at 06:14:21 (UTC).

National Elevator Industry Pen, et al v. Flex Ltd., et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 National Elevator Industry Pen, filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Flex Ltd ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15050

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRISTOL COUNTY RETIREMENT SYSTEM

DAVID KIPLING

Defendant / Appellees

MICHAEL M. MCNAMARA

KEVIN KESSEL

MICHAEL C. DENNISON

FLEX LTD.

CHRISTOPHER E. COLLIER

Plaintiff / Appellant

NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, Lead Plaintiff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nicole Marie Ryan Esquire

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94104-1715

Sara Beth Brody

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94104-1715

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Michael H. Rogers Esquire

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005-1108

James W. Johnson

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005-1108

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediaiton Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11997688] (VS) [Entered: 02/09/2021 12:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 02/03/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11969253] (VS) [Entered: 01/20/2021 10:14 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/15/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11965797]. [21-15050] (AD) [Entered: 01/15/2021 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant National Elevator Industry Pension Fund Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/15/2021. [11965066] [21-15050] (Johnson, James) [Entered: 01/15/2021 09:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant National Elevator Industry Pension Fund Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/15/2021. Transcript ordered by 02/08/2021. Transcript due 03/08/2021. Appellant National Elevator Industry Pension Fund opening brief due 04/19/2021. Appellees Christopher E. Collier, Michael C. Dennison, Flex Ltd., Kevin Kessel and Michael M. McNamara answering brief due 05/19/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11957833] (RT) [Entered: 01/08/2021 04:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less