This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/01/2022 at 18:22:08 (UTC).

National Coatings & Supplies, Inc. v. Valley Forge Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 National Coatings Supplies, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Valley Forge Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1421

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

SINGLE SOURCE, INC.

NATIONAL COATINGS & SUPPLIES, INC.

Defendant / Appellee

VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY

Amicus Curiae

AMERICAN PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE ASSOCIATION

NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

William Robinson Hartzell

Attorney at MCDOUGAL LAW FIRM, PLLC

3737 Glenwood Avenue

Raleigh, NC 27612

Gregg E. McDougal

Attorney at MCDOUGAL LAW FIRM, PLLC

3737 Glenwood Avenue

Raleigh, NC 27612

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Steven Andrew Bader

Attorney at CRANFILL SUMNER, LLP

P. O. Box 27808

Raleigh, NC 27611

H. Christopher Boehning

Attorney at PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Brian M. Lipshutz

Attorney at PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON, LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-0000

Theodore Blackburn Smyth

Attorney at CRANFILL SUMNER, LLP

P. O. Box 27808

Raleigh, NC 27611

Jennifer A. Welch

Attorney at CRANFILL SUMNER, LLP

P. O. Box 27808

Raleigh, NC 27611

Kannon K. Shanmugam

Attorney at PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON, LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-0000

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Wystan M. Ackerman

Attorney at ROBINSON & COLE LLP

280 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103-3597

Laura A. Foggan Esq.

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2595

George Edwin Reede Jr.

Attorney at ZELLE LLP

1775 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 31 ] unpublished per curiam Opinion , [ # 32 ] Judgment Order. Originating case number: 5:20-cv-00275-M. [1001205491] [21-1421] CP [Entered: 08/03/2022 10:55 AM]

#36

(#36) COURT ORDER filed denying Motion for rehearing and rehearing en banc [ # 35 ]. Copies to all parties. [1001200430] [21-1421] CP [Entered: 07/26/2022 12:10 PM]

#35

(#35) Corrected PETITION for rehearing and rehearing en banc by National Coatings & Supplies, Inc. and Single Source, Inc.. [1001190859] [21-1421] William Hartzell [Entered: 07/08/2022 03:56 PM]

#34

(#34) Mandate temporarily stayed pending ruling on petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc. [1001181044] [21-1421] CP [Entered: 06/22/2022 09:15 AM]

#33

RESTRICTED

32 #2

Notice of Judgment

32 #1

Judgment order filed

#31

(#31) UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 5:20-cv-00275-M. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1001173624] [21-1421] CP [Entered: 06/07/2022 09:15 AM]

#30

(#30) NOTICE ISSUED RE: Rule 34 pre-argument review. [1001170008] [21-1421] JH [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:19 AM]

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 31 ] unpublished per curiam Opinion , [ # 32 ] Judgment Order. Originating case number: 5:20-cv-00275-M. [1001205491] [21-1421] CP [Entered: 08/03/2022 10:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) COURT ORDER filed denying Motion for rehearing and rehearing en banc [ # 35 ]. Copies to all parties. [1001200430] [21-1421] CP [Entered: 07/26/2022 12:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Corrected PETITION for rehearing and rehearing en banc by National Coatings & Supplies, Inc. and Single Source, Inc.. [1001190859] [21-1421] William Hartzell [Entered: 07/08/2022 03:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Mandate temporarily stayed pending ruling on petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc. [1001181044] [21-1421] CP [Entered: 06/22/2022 09:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) PETITION for rehearing by National Coatings & Supplies, Inc. and Single Source, Inc. [1001180925] [21-1421]--[Edited 07/13/2022 by CP-See ECF #35 for corrected petition.] William Hartzell [Entered: 06/21/2022 10:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 5:20-cv-00275-M. Entered on Docket Date: 06/07/2022. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1001173628] [21-1421] CP [Entered: 06/07/2022 09:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 5:20-cv-00275-M. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1001173624] [21-1421] CP [Entered: 06/07/2022 09:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE ISSUED RE: Rule 34 pre-argument review. [1001170008] [21-1421] JH [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER filed granting motion to withdraw counsel [ # 28 ]. Copies to all parties. [1001106630] [21-1421] TW [Entered: 02/08/2022 02:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION by National Coatings & Supplies, Inc. and Single Source, Inc. to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney. Was a copy of the motion served on the defendant? N. Was the defendant advised of right to file response within 7 days? N. Date and method of service: 02/08/2022 ecf. [1001106353] [21-1421] Gregg McDougal [Entered: 02/08/2022 10:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DOCKETING STATEMENT by National Coatings & Supplies, Inc. and Single Source, Inc.. [21-1421] William Hartzell [Entered: 04/29/2021 01:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Single Source, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000943010] [21-1421] William Hartzell [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Coatings & Supplies, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000943006] [21-1421] William Hartzell [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William Hartzell for National Coatings & Supplies, Inc. and Single Source, Inc.. [1000942977] [21-1421] William Hartzell [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lawrence Duke for National Coatings & Supplies, Inc. and Single Source, Inc.. [1000942970] [21-1421] Lawrence Duke [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Gregg E. McDougal for National Coatings & Supplies, Inc. and Single Source, Inc.. [1000942966] [21-1421] Gregg McDougal [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Valley Forge Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000942787] [21-1421] Theodore Smyth [Entered: 04/29/2021 10:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Theodore B. Smyth for Valley Forge Insurance Company. [1000942773] [21-1421] Theodore Smyth [Entered: 04/29/2021 10:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 5:20-cv-00275-M. Mailed to: Jennifer A. Welch. [21-1421] CP [Entered: 04/15/2021 04:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:20-cv-00275-M. Case manager: CPoulsen. [21-1421] CP [Entered: 04/15/2021 04:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less