This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/06/2021 at 06:23:28 (UTC).

National ATM Council, Inc., et al v. Visa Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 National ATM Council, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Visa Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-7109

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

National ATM Council, Inc.

ATMS of the South, Inc.

Business Resource Group, Inc.

Wash Water Solutions, Inc.

ATM Bankcard Services, Inc.

Selman Telecommunications Investment Group, LLC

Turnkey ATM Solutions, LLC

Trinity Holdings Ltd, Inc.

Just ATMs USA, Inc.

901 Financial Services LLC

Not Yet Classified

Andrew Mackmin

Barbara Inglis

Sam Osborn

Mary Stoumbos

Defendant / Appellants

Visa Inc.

Visa U.S.A., Inc.

Visa International Service Association

Plus System, Inc.

Mastercard Incorporated

MasterCard International Incorporated, d/b/a Mastercard Worldwide

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Jonathan L. Rubin

Attorney at MoginRubin LLP

1615 M Street, Nw, Third Floor

Washington, DC 20037

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobel Shapiro LLP

1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew Adam Eisenstein

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

Justin Anderson

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Kenneth A. Gallo

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1919330] filed that, on the courts own motion, the parties submit by November 22, 2021, proposed formats for the briefing of these cases. [21-7109, 21-7110, 21-7111] [Entered: 10/22/2021 04:03 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1921505] filed by Alexander C. Drylewski on behalf of Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Chase Bank USA N.A.. [21-7110] (Drylewski, Alex) [Entered: 11/08/2021 09:50 PM]

Open Document

JOINT RESPONSE [1923617] to order [ # 1919330-2 ], [ # 1919330-3 ] filed by 901 Financial Services LLC, ATM Bankcard Services, Inc., ATMS of the South, Inc., Business Resource Group, Inc., Just ATMs USA, Inc., National ATM Council, Inc., Selman Telecommunications Investment Group, LLC, Trinity Holdings Ltd, Inc., Turnkey ATM Solutions, LLC, Wash Water Solutions, Inc. and Mastercard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Plus System, Inc., Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A., Inc. in 21-7109, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Chase Bank USA N.A., Barbara Inglis, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Andrew Mackmin, NB Holdings Corporation, Sam Osborn, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Mastercard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Plus System, Inc., Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A., Inc. in 21-7110, Peter Burke, Bryan Byrnes, Kent Harrison, Marin P. Heiskell and Mastercard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Plus System, Inc., Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A., Inc. in 21-7111 (Service Date: 11/22/2021 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,830 words. [21-7109, 21-7110, 21-7111] (Anderson, Justin) [Entered: 11/22/2021 05:37 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT RESPONSE [1923617] to order [ # 1919330-2 ], [ # 1919330-3 ] filed by 901 Financial Services LLC, ATM Bankcard Services, Inc., ATMS of the South, Inc., Business Resource Group, Inc., Just ATMs USA, Inc., National ATM Council, Inc., Selman Telecommunications Investment Group, LLC, Trinity Holdings Ltd, Inc., Turnkey ATM Solutions, LLC, Wash Water Solutions, Inc. and Mastercard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Plus System, Inc., Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A., Inc. in 21-7109, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Chase Bank USA N.A., Barbara Inglis, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Andrew Mackmin, NB Holdings Corporation, Sam Osborn, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Mastercard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Plus System, Inc., Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A., Inc. in 21-7110, Peter Burke, Bryan Byrnes, Kent Harrison, Marin P. Heiskell and Mastercard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Plus System, Inc., Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A., Inc. in 21-7111 (Service Date: 11/22/2021 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,830 words. [21-7109, 21-7110, 21-7111] (Anderson, Justin) [Entered: 11/22/2021 05:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1921505] filed by Alexander C. Drylewski on behalf of Appellees JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Chase Bank USA N.A.. [21-7110] (Drylewski, Alex) [Entered: 11/08/2021 09:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1919330] filed that, on the courts own motion, the parties submit by November 22, 2021, proposed formats for the briefing of these cases. [21-7109, 21-7110, 21-7111] [Entered: 10/22/2021 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1917206] filed consolidating cases 21-7110, 21-7111 (Consolidation started 10/07/2021) with 21-7109 [21-7109, 21-7110, 21-7111] [Entered: 10/07/2021 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE [1917168] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for payment of docketing fee [Case Number 21-7109: Fee Paid] [21-7109] [Entered: 10/07/2021 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1917167] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:11-cv-01803-RJL filed by MasterCard International Incorporated, Mastercard Incorporated, Plus System, Inc., Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A., Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-7109. [21-7109] [Entered: 10/07/2021 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [21-7109] [Entered: 10/07/2021 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National ATM Council, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mastercard International Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Visa International Service Association, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Visa is a litigant