This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/24/2021 at 06:12:22 (UTC).

National Association of the, et al v. Donald Trump, et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 National Association of the filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Donald Trump. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5349

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Debra Fleetwood

Carlton Strail

John Rivera, Jr.

Corey Axelrod

National Association of the Deaf

Graham Forsey

Defendant / Appellants

Donald J. Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States

Kayleigh Mcenany, in her official capacity as Press Secretary to the President of the United States

Executive Office of the President

White House Office

Office of the Vice President

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Ian S. Hoffman

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

DOJ Appellate Counsel

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Daniel Winik

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Charles Wylie Scarborough

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT [1878746] with Disclosure Listing filed by National Association of the Deaf [Service Date: 01/06/2021 ] [20-5349] (Hoffman, Ian) [Entered: 01/06/2021 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1877863] filed by National Association of the Deaf, Graham Forsey, Carlton Strail, Debra Fleetwood, John Rivera, Jr. and Corey Axelrod [Service Date: 12/30/2020 ] [20-5349] (Hoffman, Ian) [Entered: 12/30/2020 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1877720] filed by Donald J. Trump, White House Office, Executive Office of the President, Office of the Vice President and Kayleigh Mcenany [Service Date: 12/30/2020 ] [20-5349] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 12/30/2020 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1877719] filed by Donald J. Trump, White House Office, Executive Office of the President, Office of the Vice President and Kayleigh Mcenany [Service Date: 12/30/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [20-5349] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 12/30/2020 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1877718] filed by Donald J. Trump, White House Office, Executive Office of the President, Office of the Vice President and Kayleigh Mcenany [Service Date: 12/30/2020 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [20-5349] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 12/30/2020 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1877717] submitted by Donald J. Trump, White House Office, Executive Office of the President, Office of the Vice President and Kayleigh Mcenany [Service Date: 12/30/2020 ] [20-5349] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 12/30/2020 08:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1877716] submitted by Donald J. Trump, White House Office, Executive Office of the President, Office of the Vice President and Kayleigh Mcenany [Service Date: 12/30/2020 ] [20-5349] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 12/30/2020 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1877715] filed by Donald J. Trump, White House Office, Executive Office of the President, Office of the Vice President and Kayleigh Mcenany [Service Date: 12/30/2020 ] [20-5349] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 12/30/2020 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1877712] filed by Donald J. Trump, White House Office, Executive Office of the President, Office of the Vice President and Kayleigh Mcenany [Service Date: 12/30/2020 ] [20-5349] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 12/30/2020 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1875321] filed by Ian S. Hoffman on behalf of Appellees National Association of the Deaf, Graham Forsey, Carlton Strail, Debra Fleetwood, John Rivera, Jr. and Corey Axelrod. [20-5349] (Hoffman, Ian) [Entered: 12/10/2020 08:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1873386] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/30/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/30/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/30/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/30/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/30/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 12/30/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/30/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/30/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 01/14/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/30/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/30/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/30/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 01/14/2021 [20-5349] [Entered: 11/30/2020 06:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1873276] filed by Daniel Winik and co-counsel Charles W. Scarborough on behalf of Appellants Donald J. Trump, Executive Office of the President, Office of the Vice President, White House Office and Kayleigh Mcenany. [20-5349] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 11/25/2020 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1873257] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-02107-JEB filed by Executive Office of the President, Kayleigh Mcenany, Office of the Vice President, Donald J. Trump and White House Office. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5349. [20-5349] [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5349] [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF THE DEAF is a litigant

Latest cases where The White House is a litigant

Latest cases where EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Winik