This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/09/2019 at 06:34:10 (UTC).

National Association of Home B, et al v. OSHA, et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 National Association of Home B filed an Other lawsuit against OSHA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1250

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Mason Contractors Association of America

National Association of Home Builders of the United States

Associated Builders and Contractors

Respondents

Occupational Safety & Health Administration

Eugene Scalia, Secretary, U.S. Department of Labor

United States Department of Labor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Bradford Taylor Hammock Esquire

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

1650 Tysons Boulevard, Suite 700

Mclean, VA 22102

Respondent Attorney

Joseph G. Gilliland

Attorney at U.S. Department of Labor

200 Constitution Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20210

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1818253] filed by Joseph Gilliland on behalf of Respondents DOL, OSHA and Eugene Scalia. [19-1250] (Gilliland, Joseph) [Entered: 12/02/2019 03:08 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1818227] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 01/02/2020. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 01/02/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 01/02/2020. PETITIONER underlying decision due 01/02/2020. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 01/02/2020. PETITIONER procedural motions due 01/02/2020. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 01/16/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 01/02/2020. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 01/02/2020. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 01/16/2020. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 01/16/2020 [19-1250] [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:06 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED COPY [1818225] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1818222-2 ] [19-1250] [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:05 PM]

Open Document

PETITION FOR REVIEW [1818222] of a decision by federal agency filed by Associated Builders and Contractors, Mason Contractors Association of America and National Association of Home Builders of the United States [Service Date: 11/27/2019 ] Disclosure Statement: Not Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [19-1250] [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:04 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1818253] filed by Joseph Gilliland on behalf of Respondents DOL, OSHA and Eugene Scalia. [19-1250] (Gilliland, Joseph) [Entered: 12/02/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1818227] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 01/02/2020. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 01/02/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 01/02/2020. PETITIONER underlying decision due 01/02/2020. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 01/02/2020. PETITIONER procedural motions due 01/02/2020. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 01/16/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 01/02/2020. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 01/02/2020. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 01/16/2020. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 01/16/2020 [19-1250] [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED COPY [1818225] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1818222-2 ] [19-1250] [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR REVIEW [1818222] of a decision by federal agency filed by Associated Builders and Contractors, Mason Contractors Association of America and National Association of Home Builders of the United States [Service Date: 11/27/2019 ] Disclosure Statement: Not Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [19-1250] [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [19-1250] [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eugene Scalia, Secretary, US Department of Labor is a litigant

Latest cases where Associated Builders and Contractors Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES is a litigant

Latest cases where 3M COMPANY OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC is a litigant