This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/21/2021 at 05:34:36 (UTC).

National Association of Broadcasters, et al v. FCC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 National Association of Broadcasters filed an Other lawsuit against FCC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1171

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

National Association of Broadcasters

Multicultural Media, Telecom and Internet Council

National Association of Black Owned Broadcasters

Respondents

Federal Communications Commission

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Stephen B. Kinnaird

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

2050 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Richard A. Kaplan

Attorney at National Association of Broadcasters

1 M Street, Se

Washington, DC 20003

Jerianne Timmerman

Attorney at National Association of Broadcasters

1 M Street, Se

Washington, DC 20003

Robert Edward Branson

Attorney at Multicultural Media, Telecom and Internet Council

1250 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, 7Th Floor

Washington, DC 20036

David Earl Honig

Attorney at Minority Media & Telecom Council

3636 16Th Street, Nw, Suite B-366

Washington, DC 20010

James Leonard Winston

Attorney at Rubin, Winston, Diercks, Harris & Cooke, LLP

1250 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

Respondent Attorneys

William J. Scher

Attorney at Federal Communications Commission

45 L Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20554-0004

Jacob M. Lewis

Attorney at Federal Communications Commission

45 L Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20554-0004

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1910721] filed by William J. Scher and co-counsel Jacob M. Lewis on behalf of Respondent FCC. [21-1171] (Scher, William) [Entered: 08/18/2021 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1910679] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1910631-2 ] [21-1171] [Entered: 08/18/2021 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1910677] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 09/17/2021. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 09/17/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 09/17/2021. PETITIONER underlying decision due 09/17/2021. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 09/17/2021. PETITIONER procedural motions due 09/17/2021. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 10/04/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 09/17/2021. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 09/17/2021. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 10/04/2021. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 10/04/2021 [21-1171] [Entered: 08/18/2021 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1910631] of a decision by federal agency filed by National Association of Broadcasters, Multicultural Media, Telecom and Internet Council and National Association of Black Owned Broadcasters. [Service Date: 08/13/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1171] [Entered: 08/18/2021 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1171] [Entered: 08/18/2021 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Association of Broadcasters is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Matthew Lewis