This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/13/2020 at 06:08:33 (UTC).

Nathan Medina v. Tom Leonard, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 Nathan Medina filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Tom Leonard. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1676

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

TOM LEONARD, Michigan State Representative, in his official and individual capacity, joint and severally

THE DOCTORS MANAGEMENT COMPANY, joint and severally

Plaintiff / Appellant

NATHAN MEDINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Angelina Rose Irvine

Attorney at Dickinson Wright

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 4000

Detroit, MI 48226

Timothy H. Howlett

Attorney at Dickinson Wright

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 4000

Detroit, MI 48226

Jaclyn Giffen

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

200 Renaissance Center, Suite 3110

Detroit, MI 48243

William J. Vincent

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

200 Renaissance Center, Suite 3110

Detroit, MI 48243

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jack Warren Schulz

Attorney at Schulz Gotham

P.O. Box 44855

Detroit, MI 48244

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

#4

#5

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#18

19 #1

Mediator letter sent

19 #2

Stipulation to Dismiss

#20

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Letter sent by Mediation Office to extend time to file stipulation. Stipulation now due 09/22/2020. [Failure to file correctly as instructed in our letter will cause your document to be locked and you will be asked to refile.]. (MLB) [Entered: 09/08/2020 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Letter sent by Mediation Office notifying that a stipulation to dismiss is due 09/08/2020. [Failure to file correctly as instructed in our letter will cause your document to be locked and you will be asked to refile.]. (LMR) [Entered: 08/06/2020 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 09/14/2020; appellee brief due 10/14/2020. (KSF) [Entered: 08/05/2020 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docket(#17) Update fee status change to paid. APPEAL FEE PAID re 95 by plaintiff Nathan Medina in the amount of $505, receipt number AMIWDC-5537922. (KSF) [Entered: 08/05/2020 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docket(#16) Transcript, [15], has been filed in the District Court on 07/09/2020 ; Court Reporter: Mr. Paul G. Brandell ; Actual Number of Pages: 48 ; Actual Number of Volumes: 1 ; [20-1676] (PGB) [Entered: 07/29/2020 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docket(#15) TRANSCRIPT ordered from Mr. Paul G. Brandell, filed by Mr. Jack Warren Schulz for Nathan Medina. [15] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 07/28/2020 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Hon. Janet Neff ; Hearing Dates: 6/24/2020 ; Specially authorized proceedings: Arguments of Plaintiff and Defendants. Order on the Record ; Method of Payment: Private Funds CJA-24 Authorization Date: 07/29/2020 ; ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 07/29/2020. [20-1676] (JWS) [Entered: 07/29/2020 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 08/06/2020 at 10:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. Only the time of the conference has changed; the date remains the same. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 07/22/2020 08:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Tom Leonard by Angelina R. Irvine. Certificate of Service: 07/21/2020. [20-1676] (ARI) [Entered: 07/21/2020 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy H. Howlett for Appellee Tom Leonard Certificate of Service: 07/16/2020. [20-1676] (THH) [Entered: 07/16/2020 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Jaclyn Giffen for Appellee The Doctors Management Company Certificate of Service: 07/16/2020. [20-1676] (JG) [Entered: 07/16/2020 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee The Doctors Management Company by Jaclyn R. Giffen. Certificate of Service: 07/16/2020. [20-1676] (JG) [Entered: 07/16/2020 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee The Doctors Management Company by William J. Vincent. Certificate of Service: 07/16/2020. [20-1676] (WJV) [Entered: 07/16/2020 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Tom Leonard by Timothy H. Howlett. Certificate of Service: 07/16/2020. [20-1676] (THH) [Entered: 07/16/2020 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 08/06/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 07/16/2020 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket(#6) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 07/16/2020 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Jack Warren Schulz for Appellant Nathan Medina. Certificate of Service:07/15/2020. [20-1676] (JWS) [Entered: 07/15/2020 10:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jack Warren Schulz for Appellant Nathan Medina Certificate of Service: 07/15/2020. [20-1676] (JWS) [Entered: 07/15/2020 09:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Nathan Medina by Jack W. Schulz. Certificate of Service: 07/15/2020. [20-1676] (JWS) [Entered: 07/15/2020 09:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Karen Fultz. (KSF) [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Nathan Medina. Transcript needed: y. (KSF) [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack W. Schulz