This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2019 at 06:09:55 (UTC).

Nada Tadic v. Experian Information Solutions, et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 Nada Tadic filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11434

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

CONSUMERINFO.COM, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

NADA TADIC, all on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Edward S. Chang

Attorney at Jones Day

3161 Michelson Dr Ste 800

Irvine, CA 92612-4408

Rebecca Crawford Reynolds

Attorney at Jones Day

1420 Peachtree St Ne Ste 800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Jeremy S. Close

Attorney at Jones Day

3161 Michelson Dr Ste 800

Irvine, CA 92612-4408

Richard Grabowski

Attorney at Jones Day

3161 Michelson Dr Ste 800

Irvine, CA 92612-4408

Meir Feder

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey St

New York, NY 10281-1047

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Travis Edward Lynch

Attorney at Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

3621 Vinings Slope Ste 4320

Atlanta, GA 30339

Jonathan R. Miller

Attorney at Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

3621 Vinings Slope Ste 4320

Atlanta, GA 30339

James F. McDonough III

Attorney at Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

3621 Vinings Slope Ste 4320

Atlanta, GA 30339

William Lewis Garrison Jr.

Attorney at Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

2224 1St Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Christopher Boyce Hood

Attorney at Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

2224 1St Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edward S. Chang for ConsumerInfo.Com, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. [19-11434] (ECF: Edward Chang) [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:38 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ConsumerInfo.Com, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(EXPN:LON) Attorney Richard Grabowski for Appellees ConsumerInfo.Com, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11434] (ECF: Richard Grabowski) [Entered: 05/13/2019 08:18 PM]

Open Document

ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Edward S. Chang is GRANTED by clerk. [8768576-2] [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:21 PM]

Open Document #2

EXT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney James F. McDonough, III for Appellant Nada Tadic. No hearings. [19-11434] (ECF: James McDonough) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:24 AM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney James F. McDonough, III for Appellant Nada Tadic. [19-11434] (ECF: James McDonough) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:20 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 06/27/2019 filed by Nada Tadic. Motion is Unopposed. [8760724-1] [19-11434] (ECF: James McDonough) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:17 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11434] (ECF: James McDonough) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:52 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James F. McDonough, III for Nada Tadic. [19-11434] (ECF: James McDonough) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:47 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard Grabowski for ConsumerInfo.Com, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. [19-11434] (ECF: Richard Grabowski) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:25 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Meir Feder for Appellee [19-11434] (ECF: Meir Feder) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:02 PM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 04/12/2019 as to Appellant Nada Tadic. [Entered: 04/18/2019 12:27 PM]

Open Document #4

USDC Judgment- Doc #33

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #32

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edward S. Chang for ConsumerInfo.Com, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. [19-11434] (ECF: Edward Chang) [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Edward S. Chang for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and ConsumerInfo.Com, Inc. Please file your Appearance of Counsel form within three days. [Entered: 06/06/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Edward S. Chang for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and ConsumerInfo.Com, Inc. Please file your Appearance of Counsel form within three days. [Entered: 05/29/2019 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ConsumerInfo.Com, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(EXPN:LON) Attorney Richard Grabowski for Appellees ConsumerInfo.Com, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11434] (ECF: Richard Grabowski) [Entered: 05/13/2019 08:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Edward S. Chang is GRANTED by clerk. [8768576-2] [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Edward S. Chang for Appellees Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and ConsumerInfo.Com, Inc.. [8768576-1] [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Nada Tadic is GRANTED. [ # 8760724-2 ] Appellants brief due on 06/27/2019. RSR [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney James F. McDonough, III for Appellant Nada Tadic. No hearings. [19-11434] (ECF: James McDonough) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney James F. McDonough, III for Appellant Nada Tadic. [19-11434] (ECF: James McDonough) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 06/27/2019 filed by Nada Tadic. Motion is Unopposed. [8760724-1] [19-11434] (ECF: James McDonough) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11434] (ECF: James McDonough) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James F. McDonough, III for Nada Tadic. [19-11434] (ECF: James McDonough) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to William Lewis Garrison, Jr. for Nada Tadic, Christopher Boyce Hood for Nada Tadic and James F. McDonough, III for Nada Tadic. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/30/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard Grabowski for ConsumerInfo.Com, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. [19-11434] (ECF: Richard Grabowski) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Meir Feder for Appellee [19-11434] (ECF: Meir Feder) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 04/12/2019 as to Appellant Nada Tadic. [Entered: 04/18/2019 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Nada Tadic on 04/12/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/28/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/29/2019 as to Appellant Nada Tadic. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/13/2019 as to Appellee ConsumerInfo.Com, Inc. [Entered: 04/18/2019 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.