This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/23/2020 at 06:18:32 (UTC).

Muskegan Hotels, LLC, et al v. Hiren Patel, et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 Muskegan Hotels, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hiren Patel. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1475

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

MICHAEL I. MERCHANT, as Administrator of the Estate of Hasan Gulamabbas Merchant

MUSKEGAN HOTELS, LLC

GLOBAL DEVELOPMENT, INC.

M.D. 1 LLC

MD GLOBAL LLC

Defendant / Appellees

WOLIN & ROSEN, LTD.

EDWARD FITZGERALD

HIREN PATEL

STATE BANK OF TEXAS

SMITHAMUNDSEN LLC

CHANDAKRANT PATEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Paul A. Caghan

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF PAUL CAGHAN

1308 Lorelei Drive

Zion, IL 60099

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jeffrey Alan Schulman

Attorney at WOLIN & ROSEN, LTD.

55 W. Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Curtiss S. Schreiber

Attorney at DONOHUE, BROWN, MATHEWSON & SMYTH

140 S. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Karen Kies DeGrand

Attorney at DONOHUE, BROWN, MATHEWSON & SMYTH

140 S. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Ariel Weissberg

Attorney at WEISSBERG & ASSOCIATES, LTD.

401 S. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60605-1079

Jeffrey R. Tone

Attorney at KATTEN & TEMPLE LLP

209 S. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Nancy A. Temple

Attorney at KATTEN & TEMPLE LLP

209 S. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Grant A. Walsh

Attorney at CULHANE MEADOWS, PLLC

30 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Laurie A. Silvestri

70 W. Madison Street, Three First National Plaza

Chicago, IL 60602

Edward F. Dunne

Attorney at KARBAL, COHEN, ECONOMOU, SILK & DUNNE

150 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Michelle Blum

Attorney at KARBAL, COHEN, ECONOMOU, SILK & DUNNE

150 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

26 #6

Volume VI

26 #5

Volume V

26 #4

Volume IV

26 #3

Volume III

26 #2

Volume II

26 #1

Volume I

#25

#24

23 #2

Brief of Appellants with Short Appendix

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Filed Appendices VOL I through VI by Appellants Global Development, Inc., M.D. 1 LLC, MD Global LLC, Michael I. Merchant and Muskegan Hotels, LLC, per order. [26] [7082663] [20-1475] (PNR) [Entered: 05/22/2020 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Appellant's brief filed by Appellants Global Development, Inc., M.D. 1 LLC, MD Global LLC, Michael I. Merchant and Muskegan Hotels, LLC, per order. Electronically Transmitted. [25] [7082662] [20-1475] (PNR) [Entered: 05/22/2020 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER: re: Motion for leave to file instanter resubmission of brief of appellants.[ # 22 ] The motion is GRANTED. The clerk shall file instanter the appellants electronically tendered brief and separate appendix in six volumes. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellees' briefs due on or before 06/22/2020 for Edward Fitzgerald, Chandakrant Patel, Hiren Patel, SmithAmundsen LLC, State Bank of Texas and Wolin & Rosen, Ltd.. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/13/2020 for Appellants Global Development, Inc., M.D. 1 LLC, MD Global LLC, Michael I. Merchant and Muskegan Hotels, LLC. CMD [24] [7082552] [20-1475] (CG) [Entered: 05/21/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Instanter motion filed by Appellants Muskegan Hotels, LLC, Global Development, Inc., M.D. 1 LLC, MD Global LLC and Michael I. Merchant to file Brief of Appellants with Short Appendix. [23] [7082435] [20-1475] (Caghan, Paul) [Entered: 05/21/2020 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Instanter motion filed by Appellants Global Development, Inc., M.D. 1 LLC, MD Global LLC, Michael I. Merchant and Muskegan Hotels, LLC to file Motion for Leave to File Resubmission of Brief of Appellants Instanter. [22] [7082338] [20-1475] (Caghan, Paul) [Entered: 05/20/2020 11:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellants Global Development, Inc., M.D. 1 LLC, MD Global LLC, Michael I. Merchant and Muskegan Hotels, LLC. [21] [7080006] [20-1475] (PNR) [Entered: 05/11/2020 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Submitted appellant brief by Paul Caghan for Appellants Global Development, Inc., M.D. 1 LLC, MD Global LLC, Michael I. Merchant and Muskegan Hotels, LLC. [20] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7079961] [20-1475] (Caghan, Paul) [Entered: 05/11/2020 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Grant A. Walsh for Appellees Chandakrant Patel and State Bank of Texas has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [19] [7077693] [20-1475] (LJ) [Entered: 04/29/2020 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Paul A. Caghan for Appellants Muskegan Hotels, LLC, MD Global LLC, Global Development, Inc., Michael I. Merchant and M.D. 1 LLC has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [18] [7077672] [20-1475] (LJ) [Entered: 04/29/2020 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Ms. Michelle Blum for Appellee SmithAmundsen LLC has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [17] [7077670] [20-1475] (LJ) [Entered: 04/29/2020 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Curtiss S. Schreiber for Appellee Wolin & Rosen, Ltd.. [10] [7072567] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1475] [Edited 04/03/2020 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Schreiber, Curtiss) [Entered: 04/02/2020 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michelle M. Blum for Appellee SmithAmundsen LLC. [9] [7072183] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1475] --[Edited 04/02/2020 by ER - added attorney Michelle M. Blum to the docket] (Blum, Michelle) [Entered: 04/01/2020 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Edward F. Dunne for Appellee SmithAmundsen LLC. [8] [7072182] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1475] (Dunne, Edward) [Entered: 04/01/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Karen Kies DeGrand for Appellee Wolin & Rosen, Ltd.. [7] [7071768] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1475]--[Edited 03/31/2020 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (DeGrand, Karen) [Entered: 03/31/2020 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/11/2020 for Global Development, Inc., M.D. 1 LLC, MD Global LLC, Michael I. Merchant and Muskegan Hotels, LLC. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/10/2020 for Edward Fitzgerald, Chandakrant Patel, Hiren Patel, SmithAmundsen LLC, State Bank of Texas and Wolin & Rosen, Ltd.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/01/2020 for Appellants Global Development, Inc., M.D. 1 LLC, MD Global LLC, Michael I. Merchant and Muskegan Hotels, LLC. JB [7071046] [20-1475] (AD) [Entered: 03/26/2020 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, April 9, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB [5] [7071042] [20-1475] (AD) [Entered: 03/26/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Global Development, Inc., M.D. 1 LLC, MD Global LLC, Michael I. Merchant and Muskegan Hotels, LLC. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7070941] [20-1475] (MM) [Entered: 03/26/2020 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7070832] DW [3] [7070832] [20-1475] (ER) [Entered: 03/25/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Advanced Appraisal Consultants, Inc., Advanced Appraisal Consultants, LLC, Advanced Appraisal Group, Inc, William Daddono. [2] [7070598] [20-1475] (CG) [Entered: 03/24/2020 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Global Development, Inc., M.D. 1 LLC, MD Global LLC, Michael I. Merchant and Muskegan Hotels, LLC by 03/25/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 04/07/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/04/2020 for Global Development, Inc., M.D. 1 LLC, MD Global LLC, Michael I. Merchant and Muskegan Hotels, LLC [1] [7070592] [20-1475] (CG) [Entered: 03/24/2020 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SmithAmundsen LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE BANK OF TEXAS is a litigant

Latest cases where Global Development is a litigant