This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:01:27 (UTC).

Musel Master v. American Family

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Musel Master filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Family. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1248

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MUSEL MASTER, LLC, DBA New Genesis Health

Defendant / Appellee

AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Larry E. Bache Jr.

Attorney at Merlin Law Group

777 South Harbour Island Boulevard, Suite 950

Tampa, FL 33602

Timothy Graham Burchard II

Attorney at Merlin Law Group

1001 17Th Street, Suite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

Jonathan Edward Bukowski

Attorney at Merlin Law Group

1001 17Th Street, Suite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sandy Marie Eloranto

Attorney at Sutton Booker

4949 South Syracuse Street, Suite 520

Denver, CO 80237

Debra Katherine Sutton

Attorney at Sutton Booker

4949 South Syracuse Street, Suite 520

Denver, CO 80237

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10671601] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court on the appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice. This court's rules do not provide for a dismissal without prejudice; all dismissals are with prejudice. Served on 08/19/2019. [19-1248] Please see order for additional detailed information. [Entered: 08/19/2019 09:19 AM]

Open Document

[10667790] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court on its own initiative following receipt of the appellant's docketing statement. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of this court. Response due on 08/16/2019 for Musel Master, LLC. Served on 08/02/2019. [19-1248] Please see order for additional detailed information.--[Edited 08/02/2019 by LG] [Entered: 08/02/2019 08:39 AM]

Open Document

[10667063] Notice received from Musel Master, LLC that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1248] JEB [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:57 PM]

Open Document

[10666985] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Sandy Marie Eloranto and Ms. Debra Katherine Sutton for American Family Mutual Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [19-1248] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:35 PM]

Open Document

[10663799] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Larry E. Bache, Jr. for Musel Master, LLC and Mr. Jonathan Edward Bukowski for Musel Master, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1248] [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:16 PM]

Open Document

[10667062] Docketing statement filed by Musel Master, LLC. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1248] JEB [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:56 PM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10673674] Mandate issued. [19-1248] [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:35 PM]

Open Document

[10671516] Motion filed by Appellant Musel Master, LLC to dismiss case with prejudice. Served on: 08/16/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 08/26/2019 by LAB - motion construed as to dismiss with prejudice per 8/26/2019 order.] [19-1248] JEB [Entered: 08/16/2019 06:50 PM]

Open Document

[10673672] The court construes Appellant's motion to dismiss as a motion to dismiss case with prejudice, and as construed, grants the motion pursuant to FRAP 42(b); Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. See attached order for details. [19-1248] [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:35 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10673674] Mandate issued. [19-1248] [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10673672] The court construes Appellant's motion to dismiss as a motion to dismiss case with prejudice, and as construed, grants the motion pursuant to FRAP 42(b); Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. See attached order for details. [19-1248] [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • [10673668] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellant's motion to dismiss case, as contained in the court's final order. Served on 08/26/2019. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-1248] [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10671601] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court on the appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice. This court's rules do not provide for a dismissal without prejudice; all dismissals are with prejudice. Served on 08/19/2019. [19-1248] Please see order for additional detailed information. [Entered: 08/19/2019 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10671516] Motion filed by Appellant Musel Master, LLC to dismiss case with prejudice. Served on: 08/16/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 08/26/2019 by LAB - motion construed as to dismiss with prejudice per 8/26/2019 order.] [19-1248] JEB [Entered: 08/16/2019 06:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667790] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court on its own initiative following receipt of the appellant's docketing statement. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of this court. Response due on 08/16/2019 for Musel Master, LLC. Served on 08/02/2019. [19-1248] Please see order for additional detailed information.--[Edited 08/02/2019 by LG] [Entered: 08/02/2019 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • [10667237] Filed notice record is complete. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. Served on 07/31/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/09/2019 for Musel Master, LLC. [19-1248] [Entered: 07/31/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • [10667080] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/07/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1248] [Entered: 07/31/2019 07:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667063] Notice received from Musel Master, LLC that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1248] JEB [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667062] Docketing statement filed by Musel Master, LLC. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1248] JEB [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666985] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Sandy Marie Eloranto and Ms. Debra Katherine Sutton for American Family Mutual Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [19-1248] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • [10666965] Entry of appearance submitted by Sandy Eloranto and Debra Sutton for Appellant Musel Master, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 07/30/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 7/30/2019.] [19-1248] SME [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663799] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Larry E. Bache, Jr. for Musel Master, LLC and Mr. Jonathan Edward Bukowski for Musel Master, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1248] [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • [10663783] Entry of appearance submitted by Jonathan E. Bukowski; Larry E. Bache for Appellant Musel Master, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1248] --[Edited 07/17/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 7/17/2019.] JEB [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663323] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/16/2019. Docketing statement due 07/30/2019 for Musel Master, LLC. Transcript order form due 07/30/2019 for Musel Master, LLC. Notice of appearance due on 07/30/2019 for American Family Mutual Insurance Company and Musel Master, LLC [19-1248] [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.