This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2019 at 06:04:49 (UTC).

Mt. Hawley Insurance Company v. Arthur Roebuck, III, et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Mt Hawley Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Arthur Roebuck, III. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12257

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

PATRICIA R. SWINDLE, Trustee, d.b.a. Jupiter West Plaza

LESLIE J. FRYE, II

RIVIERA TRADING AND MARKETING, INC., d.b.a. Jupiter West Plaza

ARTHUR R. ROEBUCK, III

SCRIBE ENTERPRISES, INC., d.b.a. Jupiter West Plaza

Plaintiff / Appellant

MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael C. Foster

Attorney at Wargo & French, LLP

110 Se 6Th St Fl 15

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Nicola Gelormino

Attorney at Wargo & French, LLP

201 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 1000

Miami, FL 33131

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Fay E. Ryan

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig, LLP

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Carol M. Rooney

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig, LLP

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael C. Foster for Appellees Riviera Trading and Marketing, Inc., Arthur R. Roebuck, III, Scribe Enterprises, Inc. and Patricia R. Swindle. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12257] (ECF: Michael Foster) [Entered: 07/09/2019 05:07 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nicola Gelormino for Arthur R. Roebuck, III, Patricia R. Swindle TRS, Riviera Trading & Marketing and Scribe Enterprises,Inc. [19-12257] (ECF: Nicola Gelormino) [Entered: 06/27/2019 11:13 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael C. Foster for Riviera Trading and Marketing, Inc., Arthur R. Roebuck, III, Scribe Enterprises, Inc. and Patricia R. Swindle. [19-12257] (ECF: Michael Foster) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:19 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Carol M. Rooney for Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. No hearings. [Entered: 06/14/2019 03:06 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Carol M. Rooney for Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. [19-12257] (ECF: Carol Rooney) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:33 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Carol M. Rooney for Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. No hearings. [19-12257] (ECF: Carol Rooney) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:29 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12257] (ECF: Carol Rooney) [Entered: 06/14/2019 12:51 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carol M. Rooney for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. [19-12257] (ECF: Carol Rooney) [Entered: 06/13/2019 05:49 PM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 06/12/2019 as to Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:22 PM]

Open Document #4

USDC Judgment- Doc #93

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #87

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael C. Foster for Appellees Riviera Trading and Marketing, Inc., Arthur R. Roebuck, III, Scribe Enterprises, Inc. and Patricia R. Swindle. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12257] (ECF: Michael Foster) [Entered: 07/09/2019 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nicola Gelormino for Arthur R. Roebuck, III, Patricia R. Swindle TRS, Riviera Trading & Marketing and Scribe Enterprises,Inc. [19-12257] (ECF: Nicola Gelormino) [Entered: 06/27/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael C. Foster for Riviera Trading and Marketing, Inc., Arthur R. Roebuck, III, Scribe Enterprises, Inc. and Patricia R. Swindle. [19-12257] (ECF: Michael Foster) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Carol M. Rooney for Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. No hearings. [Entered: 06/14/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Carol M. Rooney for Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. [19-12257] (ECF: Carol Rooney) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Carol M. Rooney for Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. No hearings. [19-12257] (ECF: Carol Rooney) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12257] (ECF: Carol Rooney) [Entered: 06/14/2019 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carol M. Rooney for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. [19-12257] (ECF: Carol Rooney) [Entered: 06/13/2019 05:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 06/12/2019 as to Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company on 06/11/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/22/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/26/2019 as to Appellant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/10/2019 as to Appellee Riviera Trading and Marketing, Inc. [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less