This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/31/2021 at 06:07:14 (UTC).

MSP Recovery Claims, Series LL v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals America

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 MSP Recovery Claims, Series LL filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Takeda Pharmaceuticals America. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2745

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Defendant

Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellants

MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware series limited liability company

Series PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, a Delaware series limited liability company

MSPA Claims I, LLC, a Florida limited liability company

Defendant / Appellees

Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., a Delaware profit corporation

Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc., a Delaware profit corporation, FKA Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America, Inc.

Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., a Delaware profit corporation

Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, a Japanese corporation

Eli Lilly & Company, an Indiana profit corporation

Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., a Delaware profit corporation, FKA Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jorge Alejandro Mestre Esq.

Attorney at Rivero Mestre LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Boulevard

Miami, FL 33134

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

D'Lesli M. Davis

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

2200 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Darryl Anderson Esq.

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney

Houston, TX 77010

Geraldine Young

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright

1301 Mckinney St.

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI Brief due date as 02/28/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 02/28/2022, FILED.[3227563] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/14/2021 09:14 AM]

#39

(#39) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI, informing Court of proposed due date 02/28/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 12/13/2021 by CM/ECF.[3227458] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/13/2021 06:53 PM]

#37

(#37) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/13/2021 by CM/ECF. [3226900] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/13/2021 11:02 AM]

#36

(#36) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/13/2021 by CM/ECF.[3226877] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/13/2021 10:49 AM]

#34

(#34) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[3221641] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/02/2021 03:24 PM]

#29

(#29) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/01/2021 by CM/ECF. [3221144] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/01/2021 10:00 PM]

#22

(#25) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM D, [ # 22 ], on behalf of Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI, FILED.[3220974] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/01/2021 04:13 PM]

#21

(#24) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C, [ # 21 ], on behalf of Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI, FILED.[3220971] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/01/2021 04:13 PM]

#20

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#12

(#12) ORDER, dated 11/17/2021, dismissing appeal by 12/01/2021, unless Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI, submits Form D, FILED.[3213283] [21-2745] [Entered: 11/17/2021 01:15 PM]

#11

(#11) ORDER, dated 11/17/2021, dismissing appeal by 12/01/2021, unless Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI, submit Form C, FILED.[3213261] [21-2745] [Entered: 11/17/2021 01:10 PM]

#10

(#10) ORDER, dated 11/17/2021, dismissing appeal by 12/01/2021, unless Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, FILED.[3213246] [21-2745] [Entered: 11/17/2021 01:02 PM]

#9

(#9) NOTICE, to Appellees Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc., for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3213164] [21-2745] [Entered: 11/17/2021 12:28 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI Brief due date as 02/28/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 02/28/2022, FILED.[3227563] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/14/2021 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI, informing Court of proposed due date 02/28/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 12/13/2021 by CM/ECF.[3227458] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/13/2021 06:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ATTORNEY, Geraldine Young for Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc. Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. Eli Lilly & Company Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc. Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., in case 21-2745, [ # 37 ], ADDED.[3226954] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/13/2021 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/13/2021 by CM/ECF. [3226900] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/13/2021 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/13/2021 by CM/ECF.[3226877] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/13/2021 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[3221641] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/02/2021 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ATTORNEY, Darryl Anderson for Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited and Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., in case 21-2745, [ # 29 ], ADDED.[3221145] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/01/2021 10:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/01/2021 by CM/ECF. [3221144] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/01/2021 10:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM D, [ # 22 ], on behalf of Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI, FILED.[3220974] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/01/2021 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C, [ # 21 ], on behalf of Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI, FILED.[3220971] [21-2745] [Entered: 12/01/2021 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER, dated 11/17/2021, dismissing appeal by 12/01/2021, unless Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI, submits Form D, FILED.[3213283] [21-2745] [Entered: 11/17/2021 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER, dated 11/17/2021, dismissing appeal by 12/01/2021, unless Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI, submit Form C, FILED.[3213261] [21-2745] [Entered: 11/17/2021 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER, dated 11/17/2021, dismissing appeal by 12/01/2021, unless Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, FILED.[3213246] [21-2745] [Entered: 11/17/2021 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE, to Appellees Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc., for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3213164] [21-2745] [Entered: 11/17/2021 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket(#6) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney D'Lesli M. Davis for Appellees Eli Lilly & Company, Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A, Inc. and Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3203527] [21-2745] [Entered: 11/01/2021 05:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3203526] [21-2745] [Entered: 11/01/2021 05:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI, district court receipt # BNYSDC-25265508, FILED.[3203525] [21-2745] [Entered: 11/01/2021 05:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 09/29/2021, RECEIVED.[3203524] [21-2745] [Entered: 11/01/2021 05:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 08/06/2020, RECEIVED.[3203523] [21-2745] [Entered: 11/01/2021 05:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and Series PMPI, FILED. [3203519] [21-2745] [Entered: 11/01/2021 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERIES PMPI, A DESIGNATED SERIES OF MAO-MSO RECOVERY II LLC, A Delaware Series Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where MSPA Claims 1, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ELI LILLY AND COMPANY is a litigant