This case was last updated from PACER on 05/19/2019 at 06:10:14 (UTC).

MSP Recovery Claims, Series L, et al v. ALR, et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 MSP Recovery Claims, Series L filed an Other lawsuit against ALR. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11059

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

ALERE INC.

ALERE SAN DIEGO, INC.

ALERE HOME MONITORING, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellees

SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC

MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability

MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Gregory J. Trask

Attorney at Homer Bonner Jacobs, PA

1441 Brickell Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33131

Peter Winslow Homer

Attorney at Homer Bonner Jacobs, PA

1441 Brickell Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33131

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

John H. Ruiz

Attorney at MSP Recovery Law Firm

5000 Sw 75Th Ave Ste 300

Miami, FL 33155

Gino Moreno

Attorney at MSP Recovery Law Firm

5000 Sw 75Th Ave Ste 300

Miami, FL 33155

Arlenys Perdomo

Attorney at MSP Recovery Law Firm

5000 Sw 75Th Ave Ste 300

Miami, FL 33155

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Reply to response filed by Appellants Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., Alere San Diego, Inc. and ALR. [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 05/16/2019 05:25 PM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI [19-11059] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 05/13/2019 09:39 PM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellants Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., Alere San Diego, Inc. and ALR [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 05/13/2019 07:59 PM]

Open Document #2

JQ Issued

Open Document #1

JUR-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Court Order Filed

Open Document #2

EXT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 05/29/2019 filed by Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., Alere San Diego, Inc. and ALR. Motion is Unopposed. [8747057-1] [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:27 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Arlenys Perdomo for Appellees MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11059] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:11 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Arlenys Perdomo [19-11059] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:47 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Gregory J. Trask for Appellants Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., ALR and Alere San Diego, Inc.. [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:47 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Gregory J. Trask for Appellants Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., ALR and Alere San Diego, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 04/03/2019 12:37 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Gregory J. Trask for Appellants Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., ALR and Alere San Diego, Inc.. No hearings. [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:50 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Gregory J. Trask for Appellants Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., ALR and Alere San Diego, Inc.. No hearings. [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:59 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Peter Winslow Homer for Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., ALR and Alere San Diego, Inc.. [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:48 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gregory J. Trask for Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., ALR and Alere San Diego, Inc.. [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:47 PM]

Open Document #3

DC #30 Order

Open Document #2

DC #34 Order

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to response filed by Appellants Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., Alere San Diego, Inc. and ALR. [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 05/16/2019 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DOCKETED IN ERROR***Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellants Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., ALR and Alere San Diego, Inc..--[Edited 05/14/2019 by BWH] [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI [19-11059] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 05/13/2019 09:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellants Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., Alere San Diego, Inc. and ALR [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 05/13/2019 07:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to ALR, Alere San Diego, Inc. and MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI. [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: The motion for extension of time to and including May 29, 2019, in which to file Appellants brief is GRANTED, with the appendix due seven (7) days from the filing of the brief. [ # 8747057-2 ] AJ [Entered: 04/19/2019 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 05/29/2019 filed by Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., Alere San Diego, Inc. and ALR. Motion is Unopposed. [8747057-1] [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Arlenys Perdomo for Appellees MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11059] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Arlenys Perdomo [19-11059] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Gregory J. Trask for Appellants Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., ALR and Alere San Diego, Inc.. [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Gregory J. Trask for Appellants Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., ALR and Alere San Diego, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 04/03/2019 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Gregory J. Trask for Appellants Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., ALR and Alere San Diego, Inc.. No hearings. [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Gregory J. Trask for Appellants Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., ALR and Alere San Diego, Inc.. No hearings. [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Peter Winslow Homer for Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., ALR and Alere San Diego, Inc.. [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gregory J. Trask for Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., ALR and Alere San Diego, Inc.. [19-11059] (ECF: Gregory Trask) [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Alere Home Monitoring, Inc., ALR and Alere San Diego, Inc. on 03/19/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/29/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/03/2019 as to Appellant Alere Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/17/2019 as to Appellee MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC [Entered: 03/26/2019 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.