This case was last updated from PACER on 07/28/2019 at 06:07:26 (UTC).

MSP Recovery Claims, Series, et al v. Northland Insurance Company, et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 MSP Recovery Claims, Series filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Northland Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12092

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants and Not Yet Classified

MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC

MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC

SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II LLC

NORTHLAND CASUALTY COMPANY

NORTHLAND INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant / Appellees and Not Yet Classified

NORTHLAND CASUALTY COMPANY

NORTHLAND INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

John H. Ruiz

Attorney at MSP Recovery Law Firm

2701 S Le Jeune Rd 10Fl

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Christine M. Lugo

Attorney at MSP Recovery Law Firm

2701 S Le Jeune Rd 10Fl

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Arlenys Perdomo

Attorney at MSP Recovery Law Firm

2701 S Le Jeune Rd 10Fl

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Laura E. Besvinick

Attorney at Stroock Stroock & Lavan, LLP

200 Biscayne Blvd Ste 3100

Miami, FL 33131

Bryce L. Friedman

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett, LLP

425 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10017-3954

Not Yet Classified and Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Laura E. Besvinick

Attorney at Stroock Stroock & Lavan, LLP

200 Biscayne Blvd Ste 3100

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Arlenys Perdomo for Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI. No hearings. [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 06/11/2019 05:31 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Laura E. Besvinick for Appellees Northland Casualty Company and Northland Insurance Company. No hearings. [19-12092] (ECF: Laura Besvinick) [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:54 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Laura E. Besvinick for Appellees-Cross Appellants Northland Insurance Company and Northland Casualty Company and Bryce L. Friedman for Appellees-Cross Appellants Northland Insurance Company and Northland Casualty Company. No hearings. [Entered: 06/18/2019 11:27 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to consolidate appeals 19-12029, 19-12091, 19-12085, 19-12092, 19-12358 and 19-12357 filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI. Motion is Unopposed. [8815760-1] [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:47 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Bryce L. Friedman for Appellees Northland Casualty Company and Northland Insurance Company. [19-12092] (ECF: Bryce Friedman) [Entered: 06/12/2019 01:41 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bryce L. Friedman for Appellees Northland Insurance Company, Northland Casualty Company [19-12092] (ECF: Bryce Friedman) [Entered: 06/11/2019 06:21 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 06/12/2019 05:08 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Arlenys Perdomo for Appellants MSP Recovery Claims Series, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, and Series PMPI [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 06/08/2019 01:55 PM]

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

DC Order #16 Granting Motion for Remand

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bryce L. Friedman for Appellees-Cross Appellants Northland Casualty Company and Northland Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12092] (ECF: Bryce Friedman) [Entered: 06/26/2019 04:47 PM]

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Arlenys Perdomo for Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI. [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 06/11/2019 05:32 PM]

Open Document #2

DC Order Granting Motion for Remand doc#16

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to consolidate appeals 19-12029, 19-12091, 19-12085, 19-12092, 19-12358 and 19-12357 filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI. Motion is Unopposed. [8815760-1] [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bryce L. Friedman for Appellees-Cross Appellants Northland Casualty Company and Northland Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12092] (ECF: Bryce Friedman) [Entered: 06/26/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Laura E. Besvinick for Appellees-Cross Appellants Northland Insurance Company and Northland Casualty Company and Bryce L. Friedman for Appellees-Cross Appellants Northland Insurance Company and Northland Casualty Company. No hearings. [Entered: 06/18/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Laura E. Besvinick for Appellees Northland Casualty Company and Northland Insurance Company. No hearings. [19-12092] (ECF: Laura Besvinick) [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellees-Cross Appellants Northland Casualty Company and Northland Insurance Company on 06/11/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 06/18/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 06/12/2019 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Bryce L. Friedman for Appellees Northland Casualty Company and Northland Insurance Company. [19-12092] (ECF: Bryce Friedman) [Entered: 06/12/2019 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bryce L. Friedman for Appellees Northland Insurance Company, Northland Casualty Company [19-12092] (ECF: Bryce Friedman) [Entered: 06/11/2019 06:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Arlenys Perdomo for Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI. [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 06/11/2019 05:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Arlenys Perdomo for Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI. No hearings. [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 06/11/2019 05:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Arlenys Perdomo for Appellants MSP Recovery Claims Series, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, and Series PMPI [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 06/08/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC and MSPA Claims 1, LLC on 05/28/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/08/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/12/2019 as to Appellant MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/26/2019 as to Appellee Northland Insurance Company [Entered: 06/03/2019 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.