This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/30/2019 at 06:10:03 (UTC).

Moure v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corp

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Moure filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Federal Deposit Insurance Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3600

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Comvaltech Corp.

Comvaltech Corp. of Puerto Rico

Defendant / Appellees

Pfizer Global Manufacturing

235 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

Scottia Bank of Puerto Rico

Lilly Del Caribe Inc.

Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Wyeth Whitehall Pharmaceuticals Inc.

235 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

Pfizer Pharmaceuticals Industry Association of Puerto Rico

Liquid Capital Exchange Inc.

525 North Macarthur Boulevard

Irving, TX 75038

Pfizer Phurmaceuticals Inc.

235 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

Hector Rafael Figueroa Fernondez

Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

235 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC

235 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

Plaintiff / Appellant

Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure

East Hartford, CT 06118

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Pfizer Global Manufacturing

235 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

Scottia Bank of Puerto Rico

Lilly Del Caribe Inc.

Wyeth Whitehall Pharmaceuticals Inc.

235 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

Pfizer Pharmaceuticals Industry Association of Puerto Rico

Liquid Capital Exchange Inc.

525 North Macarthur Boulevard

Irving, TX 75038

Pfizer Phurmaceuticals Inc.

235 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

235 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC

235 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure

Attorney at Comvaltech Corp.

22 Sioux Rd

East Hartford, CT 06118

 

Court Documents

#59

#57

#56

#53

#51

#50

#47

#45

#44

#43

#40

#39

#38

#32

#31

#30

#28

#25

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion for assignment of pro bono counsel, [58], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure, FILED.[2734088] [19-3600] [Entered: 12/19/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • (#58) MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure, FILED. No Service. [2734083] [19-3600] [Entered: 12/19/2019 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to file document, [55], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure, FILED.[2729448] [19-3600] [Entered: 12/13/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to compel, [54], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure, FILED.[2729428] [19-3600] [Entered: 12/13/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • (#55) MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure, FILED. Service date 12/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2729235] [19-3600] [Entered: 12/13/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • (#54) MOTION, to compel, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure, FILED. Service date 12/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2729157] [19-3600] [Entered: 12/13/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion for assignment of pro bono counsel, [52], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure, FILED.[2728563] [19-3600] [Entered: 12/13/2019 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • (#52) MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure, FILED. Service date 12/12/2019 by CM/ECF. [2728446] [19-3600] [Entered: 12/12/2019 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [49], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure, FILED.[2728268] [19-3600] [Entered: 12/12/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [48], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure, FILED.[2728258] [19-3600] [Entered: 12/12/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion for assignment of pro bono counsel, [ # 13 ], on behalf of Appellant Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure, FILED.[2701070] [19-3600] [Entered: 11/07/2019 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure, FILED.[2700469] [19-3600] [Entered: 11/07/2019 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • (#13) MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, on behalf of Appellant Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure, FILED. No Service.[2701023] [19-3600] [Entered: 11/07/2019 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2695294] [19-3600] [Entered: 11/01/2019 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2695292] [19-3600] [Entered: 11/01/2019 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry #33, dated 10/31/2019, RECEIVED.[2695291] [19-3600] [Entered: 11/01/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry #32, dated 10/31/2019, RECEIVED.[2695290] [19-3600] [Entered: 11/01/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry #29, dated 10/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2695287] [19-3600] [Entered: 11/01/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry #27, dated 10/18/2019, RECEIVED.[2695282] [19-3600] [Entered: 11/01/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure, FILED. [2695264] [19-3600] [Entered: 11/01/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pfizer Global Manufacturing is a litigant