This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:40 (UTC).

Mounira Doss v. GMI

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Mounira Doss filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against GMI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12714

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants and Not Yet Classified

MOUNIRA DOSS, individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated

GENERAL MILLS, INC.

Defendant / Appellee and Not Yet Classified

GENERAL MILLS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Jeffrey Louis Haberman

Attorney at Schlesinger Law Offices, PA

1212 Se 3Rd Ave

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Chris S. Coutroulis

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000, Po Box 3239

Tampa, FL 33601

Angela Teresa Puentes

Attorney at Carlton Fields, PA

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 4200

Miami, FL 33131

Joseph H. Lang Jr.

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000, Po Box 3239

Tampa, FL 33601

Not Yet Classified and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Chris S. Coutroulis

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000, Po Box 3239

Tampa, FL 33601

Angela Teresa Puentes

Attorney at Carlton Fields, PA

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 4200

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellant-Cross Appellee Mounira Doss. [19-12714] (ECF: Jeffrey Haberman) [Entered: 09/04/2019 02:01 PM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant-Cross Appellee Mounira Doss [19-12714] (ECF: Jeffrey Haberman) [Entered: 08/28/2019 08:13 PM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant GMI [19-12714] (ECF: Joseph Lang) [Entered: 08/28/2019 05:12 PM]

Open Document

Appellant-Cross Appellee's Brief filed by Appellant-Cross Appellee Mounira Doss. [19-12714] (ECF: Jeffrey Haberman) [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:40 PM]

Open Document #1

JQ Issued

Open Document #2

JUR-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Joseph H. Lang, Jr. for Appellee-Cross Appellant GMI. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12714] (ECF: Joseph Lang) [Entered: 08/08/2019 10:08 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey Louis Haberman for Mounira Doss. [19-12714] (ECF: Jeffrey Haberman) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:11 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Chris S. Coutroulis for GMI. [19-12714] (ECF: Joseph Lang) [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:51 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph H. Lang, Jr. for General Mills, Inc. [19-12714] (ECF: Joseph Lang) [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:49 PM]

Open Document #2

usdc 36

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

usdc 37

Open Document #4

DKT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jeffrey Louis Haberman for Appellant Mounira Doss. [19-12714] (ECF: Jeffrey Haberman) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:15 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jeffrey Louis Haberman for Appellant Mounira Doss. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12714] (ECF: Jeffrey Haberman) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:09 PM]

Open Document #3

usdc 37

Open Document #4

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant-Cross Appellee Mounira Doss. 1 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 09/05/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellant-Cross Appellee Mounira Doss. [19-12714] (ECF: Jeffrey Haberman) [Entered: 09/04/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant-Cross Appellee Mounira Doss. [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant-Cross Appellee Mounira Doss [19-12714] (ECF: Jeffrey Haberman) [Entered: 08/28/2019 08:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant GMI [19-12714] (ECF: Joseph Lang) [Entered: 08/28/2019 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant-Cross Appellee's Brief filed by Appellant-Cross Appellee Mounira Doss. [19-12714] (ECF: Jeffrey Haberman) [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Mounira Doss and GMI. [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Joseph H. Lang, Jr. for Appellee-Cross Appellant GMI. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12714] (ECF: Joseph Lang) [Entered: 08/08/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey Louis Haberman for Mounira Doss. [19-12714] (ECF: Jeffrey Haberman) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Chris S. Coutroulis for GMI. [19-12714] (ECF: Joseph Lang) [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph H. Lang, Jr. for General Mills, Inc. [19-12714] (ECF: Joseph Lang) [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant GMI on 07/25/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 08/01/2019 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jeffrey Louis Haberman for Appellant Mounira Doss. [19-12714] (ECF: Jeffrey Haberman) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jeffrey Louis Haberman for Appellant Mounira Doss. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12714] (ECF: Jeffrey Haberman) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Mounira Doss on 07/12/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/28/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/29/2019 as to Appellant Mounira Doss. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/12/2019 as to Appellee General Mills, Inc. [Entered: 07/19/2019 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.