This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/02/2022 at 06:11:46 (UTC).

Motorola Solutions, Inc., et al v. Hytera Communications Corporation Ltd.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 Motorola Solutions, Inc , filed an Other lawsuit against Hytera Communications Corporation Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2370

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.

MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS MALAYSIA SDN. BHD.

Defendant / Appellant

HYTERA COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Adam R. Alper

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

555 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

John C. O'Quinn

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Michael W. De Vries

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

555 S. Flower Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jason M. Wilcox

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Boyd Cloern

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-0000

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Hytera Communications Corporation Ltd.. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. Appeal Nos. 22-1919, 22-1839, 22-1118, 22-1114, 21-3045 [2] [7253444] [22-2370] (Cloern, Boyd) [Entered: 08/09/2022 10:24 AM]

#3

(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John C. O'Quinn, Adam R. Alper, Michael W. De Vries, and Jason M. Wilcox for Appellees Motorola Solutions Malaysia SDN. BHD. and Motorola Solutions, Inc.. [3] [7254743] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2370]--[Edited 08/16/2022 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (O'Quinn, John) [Entered: 08/15/2022 07:05 PM]

#4

(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Boyd Cloern for Appellant Hytera Communications Corporation Ltd.. [4] [7254885] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2370] (Cloern, Boyd) [Entered: 08/16/2022 12:55 PM]

#5

(#5) ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders that these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. The briefing schedule is as follows: The defendant shall file its opening brief and required short appendix in the main appeal docketed in 22-2370 on or before September 12, 2022. The plaintiffs shall file their combined responsive brief in the main appeal and opening brief and appendix in the cross-appeal docketed in 22-2413 on or before October 12, 2022. The defendant shall file its combined reply brief, if any, in the main appeal and responsive brief in the cross-appeal on or before November 14, 2022. The plaintiffs shall file their reply brief, if any, in the cross-appeal on or before December 5, 2022. DW [5] [7254950] [22-2370, 22-2413] (CG) [Entered: 08/16/2022 03:06 PM]

#6

(#6) Motion filed by Appellant Hytera Communications Corporation Ltd. in 22-2370 to extend time to file appellant brief. [6] [7258443] [22-2370, 22-2413] (Cloern, Boyd) [Entered: 09/02/2022 01:51 PM]

#7

(#7) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief on main appeal. [ # 6 ] Main appeal brief due on or before 11/14/2022 for Hytera Communications Corporation Ltd.. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 12/14/2022 for Motorola Solutions Malaysia SDN. BHD. and Motorola Solutions, Inc.. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 01/13/2023 for Appellant Hytera Communications Corporation Ltd.. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 02/03/2023 for Appellants Motorola Solutions Malaysia SDN. BHD. and Motorola Solutions, Inc. SCR [7] [7258702] [22-2370, 22-2413] (HTP) [Entered: 09/06/2022 02:41 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief on main appeal. [ # 6 ] Main appeal brief due on or before 11/14/2022 for Hytera Communications Corporation Ltd.. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 12/14/2022 for Motorola Solutions Malaysia SDN. BHD. and Motorola Solutions, Inc.. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 01/13/2023 for Appellant Hytera Communications Corporation Ltd.. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 02/03/2023 for Appellants Motorola Solutions Malaysia SDN. BHD. and Motorola Solutions, Inc. SCR [7] [7258702] [22-2370, 22-2413] (HTP) [Entered: 09/06/2022 02:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion filed by Appellant Hytera Communications Corporation Ltd. in 22-2370 to extend time to file appellant brief. [6] [7258443] [22-2370, 22-2413] (Cloern, Boyd) [Entered: 09/02/2022 01:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders that these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. The briefing schedule is as follows: The defendant shall file its opening brief and required short appendix in the main appeal docketed in 22-2370 on or before September 12, 2022. The plaintiffs shall file their combined responsive brief in the main appeal and opening brief and appendix in the cross-appeal docketed in 22-2413 on or before October 12, 2022. The defendant shall file its combined reply brief, if any, in the main appeal and responsive brief in the cross-appeal on or before November 14, 2022. The plaintiffs shall file their reply brief, if any, in the cross-appeal on or before December 5, 2022. DW [5] [7254950] [22-2370, 22-2413] (CG) [Entered: 08/16/2022 03:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Boyd Cloern for Appellant Hytera Communications Corporation Ltd.. [4] [7254885] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2370] (Cloern, Boyd) [Entered: 08/16/2022 12:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John C. O'Quinn, Adam R. Alper, Michael W. De Vries, and Jason M. Wilcox for Appellees Motorola Solutions Malaysia SDN. BHD. and Motorola Solutions, Inc.. [3] [7254743] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2370]--[Edited 08/16/2022 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (O'Quinn, John) [Entered: 08/15/2022 07:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Hytera Communications Corporation Ltd.. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. Appeal Nos. 22-1919, 22-1839, 22-1118, 22-1114, 21-3045 [2] [7253444] [22-2370] (Cloern, Boyd) [Entered: 08/09/2022 10:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 08/17/2022. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Hytera Communications Corporation Ltd. by 08/09/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 09/12/2022 for Hytera Communications Corporation Ltd. [1] [7252463] [22-2370] (AD) [Entered: 08/04/2022 12:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less