This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2019 at 06:11:38 (UTC).

Morrison v. Barcel USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 Morrison filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Barcel USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-176

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Barcel USA, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

Aurora Morrison, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Thomas E. Fox Esq.

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

4 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

C.K. Lee Esq.

Attorney at Lee Litigation Group, PLLC

30 East 39Th Street

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/03/2019, RECEIVED.[2477415] [19-176] [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:23 PM]

#29

(#29) NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[2510382] [19-176] [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:57 AM]

#25

(#25) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2510081] [19-176] [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:55 AM]

#13

(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Aurora Morrison, FILED. Service date 02/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2487737] [19-176] [Entered: 02/01/2019 04:06 PM]

#20

(#20) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/12/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2489838] [19-176] [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:22 PM]

#31

(#31) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 03/05/2019, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][2510389] [19-176] [Entered: 03/05/2019 12:01 PM]

#30

(#30) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[2510387] [19-176] [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:58 AM]

#22

(#22) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 03/04/2019 by CM/ECF.[2509537] [19-176] [Entered: 03/04/2019 01:23 PM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#18

(#18) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 03/12/2019, appellee's brief due date as 04/16/2019, TRANSMITTED.[2489057] [19-176] [Entered: 02/05/2019 08:46 AM]

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barcel USA, LLC, FILED. Service date 01/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2484676] [19-176] [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:37 PM]

#9

(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Aurora Morrison, FILED. Service date 01/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2485590] [19-176] [Entered: 01/30/2019 01:58 PM]

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#12

(#12) ORDER, dated 02/01/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/15/2019, unless Appellant Aurora Morrison, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[2487343] [19-176] [Entered: 02/01/2019 11:48 AM]

#17

(#17) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2489056] [19-176] [Entered: 02/05/2019 08:45 AM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 03/05/2019, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][2510389] [19-176] [Entered: 03/05/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[2510387] [19-176] [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[2510382] [19-176] [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2510081] [19-176] [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 03/04/2019 by CM/ECF.[2509537] [19-176] [Entered: 03/04/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/12/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2489838] [19-176] [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 03/12/2019, appellee's brief due date as 04/16/2019, TRANSMITTED.[2489057] [19-176] [Entered: 02/05/2019 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2489056] [19-176] [Entered: 02/05/2019 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Aurora Morrison, FILED. Service date 02/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2487737] [19-176] [Entered: 02/01/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER, dated 02/01/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/15/2019, unless Appellant Aurora Morrison, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[2487343] [19-176] [Entered: 02/01/2019 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Aurora Morrison, FILED. Service date 01/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2485590] [19-176] [Entered: 01/30/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Aurora Morrison, FILED. Service date 01/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2485570] [19-176] [Entered: 01/30/2019 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barcel USA, LLC, FILED. Service date 01/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2484676] [19-176] [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2477420] [19-176] [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • (#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Aurora Morrison, district court receipt # ANYSDC-16197925, FILED.[2477417] [19-176] [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/03/2019, RECEIVED.[2477415] [19-176] [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Aurora Morrison, FILED. [2477405] [19-176] [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.