This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 06:06:09 (UTC).

Morgan v. Perez

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Morgan filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Perez. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-432

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

Patrick Morgan

Fishkill, NY 12524

Respondent / Appellee

Ada Perez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Patrick Morgan

Attorney at Downstate Correctional Facility

Box F, Red Schoolhouse Road

Fishkill, NY 12524

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Nancy Darragh Killian Esq.

Attorney at Bronx County District Attorney's Office

198 East 161St Street

Bronx, NY 10451

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Patrick Morgan, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by US mail.[2514630] [19-432] [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:28 AM]

#11

(#11) PAPERS, Authorization letter, RECEIVED.[2514627] [19-432] [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:27 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#6

(#6) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [5], on behalf of Appellant Patrick Morgan, copy to pro se, FILED.[2502473] [19-432] [Entered: 02/21/2019 04:26 PM]

#15

(#15) ORDER, dated 03/22/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/12/2019, unless Appellant Patrick Morgan, moves for certificate of appealability, copy to pro se, FILED.[2524321] [19-432] [Entered: 03/22/2019 03:44 PM]

8 #2

Supporting Document

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#9

(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Patrick Morgan, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by US mail.[2514623] [19-432] [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:26 AM]

8 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#4

(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2501158] [19-432] [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:19 PM]

#7

(#7) NOTICE, to Appellee Ada Perez , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2512355] [19-432] [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:16 AM]

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#10

(#10) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Patrick Morgan, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by US mail.[2514625] [19-432] [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:27 AM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/04/2019, denying certificate of appealability, RECEIVED.[2501152] [19-432] [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:18 PM]

#16

(#16) MOTION, for certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Patrick Morgan, FILED. Service date 04/10/2019 by US mail.[2539572] [19-432] [Entered: 04/15/2019 08:46 AM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION, for certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Patrick Morgan, FILED. Service date 04/10/2019 by US mail.[2539572] [19-432] [Entered: 04/15/2019 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER, dated 03/22/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/12/2019, unless Appellant Patrick Morgan, moves for certificate of appealability, copy to pro se, FILED.[2524321] [19-432] [Entered: 03/22/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS [ # 12 ], on behalf of Appellant Patrick Morgan, FILED.[2514644] [19-432] [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Patrick Morgan, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by US mail.[2514630] [19-432] [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PAPERS, Authorization letter, RECEIVED.[2514627] [19-432] [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Patrick Morgan, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by US mail.[2514625] [19-432] [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Patrick Morgan, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by US mail.[2514623] [19-432] [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ada Perez, FILED. Service date 03/07/2019 by US mail.[2512390] [19-432] [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE, to Appellee Ada Perez , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2512355] [19-432] [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [5], on behalf of Appellant Patrick Morgan, copy to pro se, FILED.[2502473] [19-432] [Entered: 02/21/2019 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • (#5) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Patrick Morgan, FILED. Incomplete Service.[2502455] [19-432] [Entered: 02/21/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2501158] [19-432] [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2501154] [19-432] [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/04/2019, denying certificate of appealability, RECEIVED.[2501152] [19-432] [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Patrick Morgan, FILED. [2501146] [19-432] [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.