This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2019 at 06:09:22 (UTC).

Morgan, et al v. Water Toy Shop, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Morgan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Water Toy Shop, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1290

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

MARK A. CASTRO

Defendant / Appellees

AXEL ACOSTA CASIANO

WATER TOY SHOP, INC.

IRONSHORE INDEMNITY, INC.

ACOSTA WATER SPORTS, INC.

ACOSTA WATER SPORTS, INC., d/b/a Archie Jet Ski Rentals

Plaintiff / Appellants

JASMINE NICOLE MORGAN

JARITA KENNEDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ian Carvajal-Zarabozo

Attorney at Saldana Carvajal & Velez-Rive PSC

166 Ave De La Constitucion

San Juan, PR 00901

Fernando Sabater-Clavell

Attorney at Saldana Carvajal & Velez-Rive PSC

166 Ave De La Constitucion

San Juan, PR 00901

Carolene Fontanet-Smith

Attorney at Saldana Carvajal & Velez-Rive PSC

166 Ave De La Constitucion

San Juan, PR 00901

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Paul E. Calvesbert-Borgos

Attorney at Calvesbert Law LLC

1353 Luis Vigoreaux Ave, Garden Hills Plaza Pmb 508

Guaynabo, PR 00966

Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira

1353 Rd 19

Guaynabo, PR 00966-2700

Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall

Attorney at Rivera-Aspinall, Garriga & Fernandini

1647 Adams St, Summit Hills

San Juan, PR 00920-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Corporate Disclosure Statement

Open Document #1

Notice of Appearance

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Jarita Kennedy and Jasmine Nicole Morgan filed by Attorney Eduardo R Jenks-Carballeira. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1290] (ERJ) [Entered: 03/27/2019 04:46 PM]

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document

ORDER entered: Upon consideration of Appellees Axel Acosta Casiano, Acosta Water Sports, Inc., Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. and Water Toy Shop, Inc.'s motion to clarify, appellees are directed to Fed. R. App. P. 31(a)(1) and 1st Cir. 31.0(a)(1). Appellees must serve and file a brief within 30 days after appellants' brief is served. Appellees' request for an extension is premature as appellants' brief has not yet been filed. [19-1290] (KC) [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:26 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Jarita Kennedy and Jasmine Nicole Morgan filed by Attorney Paul E. Calvesbert. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1290] (PEC) [Entered: 03/27/2019 10:59 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Jarita Kennedy and Jasmine Nicole Morgan. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1290] (ERJ) [Entered: 03/28/2019 09:00 AM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Jasmine Nicole Morgan and Jarita Kennedy. Brief and Appendix due 07/01/2019 for appellant Jarita Kennedy and Jasmine Nicole Morgan. [19-1290] (KC) [Entered: 05/01/2019 01:51 PM]

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Acosta Water Sports, Inc., Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. and Water Toy Shop, Inc. [19-1290] (KC) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:22 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER entered: Upon consideration of Appellees Axel Acosta Casiano, Acosta Water Sports, Inc., Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. and Water Toy Shop, Inc.'s motion to clarify, appellees are directed to Fed. R. App. P. 31(a)(1) and 1st Cir. 31.0(a)(1). Appellees must serve and file a brief within 30 days after appellants' brief is served. Appellees' request for an extension is premature as appellants' brief has not yet been filed. [19-1290] (KC) [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to clarify order [ # 6251095-2 ] filed by Appellees Axel Acosta Casiano, Acosta Water Sports, Inc., Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. and Water Toy Shop, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 05/08/2019. [19-1290] (CF) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Jasmine Nicole Morgan and Jarita Kennedy. Brief and Appendix due 07/01/2019 for appellant Jarita Kennedy and Jasmine Nicole Morgan. [19-1290] (KC) [Entered: 05/01/2019 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Jarita Kennedy and Jasmine Nicole Morgan. Certificate of service dated 05/01/2019. [19-1290] (ERJ) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 05/13/2019 for appellant Jarita Kennedy and Jasmine Nicole Morgan. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1290] (KC) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Acosta Water Sports, Inc., Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. and Water Toy Shop, Inc. [19-1290] (KC) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Water Toy Shop, Inc., Acosta Water Sports, Inc., Axel Acosta Casiano and Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. filed by Attorney Carolene Fontanet Smith. Certificate of service dated 03/29/2019. [19-1290] (CF) [Entered: 03/29/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Jarita Kennedy and Jasmine Nicole Morgan. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1290] (ERJ) [Entered: 03/28/2019 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Jarita Kennedy and Jasmine Nicole Morgan filed by Attorney Eduardo R Jenks-Carballeira. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1290] (ERJ) [Entered: 03/27/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Jarita Kennedy and Jasmine Nicole Morgan filed by Attorney Paul E. Calvesbert. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1290] (PEC) [Entered: 03/27/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #112) filed by Appellants Jarita Kennedy and Jasmine Nicole Morgan. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 04/08/2019. [19-1290] (KC) [Entered: 03/25/2019 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.