This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/21/2022 at 06:07:02 (UTC).

Monroe Energy, LLC v. EPA

Case Summary

On 02/09/2016 Monroe Energy, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against EPA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    16-1044

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Monroe Energy, LLC

Respondent

Environmental Protection Agency

Intervenors

National Corn Growers Association

Growth Energy

U.S. Oil & Refining Co.

Valero Energy Corporation

Biotechnology Innovation Organization

Americans for Clean Energy

Calumet Specialty Products Partners, L.P.

Renewable Fuels Association

American Coalition for Ethanol

American Refining Group, Inc.

National Sorghum Producers

Amicus Curiae

Canola Council of Canada

Small Retailers Coalition

Arvegenix, Inc.

American Soybean Association

U.S. Canola Association

National Renderers Association

CVR Energy, Inc.

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

David William DeBruin

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

1099 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001-4412

Thomas John Perrelli

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

1099 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001-4412

Matthew E. Price

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

1099 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001-4412

Respondent Attorney

John Charles Cruden

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 23986, L'Enfant Plaza Station

Washington, DC 20026-3986

Intervenor Attorneys

Mark C. Kalpin

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

David Lehn

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1420

Robert Jack McKeehan Esquire

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1420

Edward N. Siskel

Attorney at Corporation Counsel of the City of Chicago

30 North Lasalle Street, Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60602

Albert M. Ferlo Jr.

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 13Th Street, Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Krista Hughes

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 13Th Street, Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Clara George Poffenberger

2933 Fairhill Road

Fairfax, VA 22031

Lisa Marie Jaeger

Attorney at Bracewell LLP

2001 M Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20036

Samara Lackman Kline

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

Brittany M. Pemberton

Attorney at Bracewell LLP

2001 M Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20036

Evan Andrew Young

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

98 San Jacinto Boulevard, Suite 1500

Austin, TX 78701-4039

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Jerome Christian Muys Jr.

Attorney at Sullivan & Worcester, LLP

1666 K Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

Suzanne Beaudette Murray

2323 Victory Avenue, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75219

Lee M. Smithyman Esquire

Attorney at Smithyman & Zakoura Chartered

750 Commerce Plaza Ii, 7400 West 110Th Street

Overland Park, KS 66210

Other Attorneys

Bryan Michael Killian

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Sandra Patricia Franco

Attorney at National Biodiesel Board

1331 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw, Suite 505

Washington, DC 20004

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

REPORT [1956454] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status [Service Date: 07/26/2022 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 07/26/2022 11:30 AM]

Open Document

REPORT [1948328] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status [Service Date: 05/27/2022 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 05/27/2022 10:09 AM]

Open Document

REPORT [1940824] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status [Service Date: 03/28/2022 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 03/28/2022 03:07 PM]

Open Document

REPORT [1932096] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status [Service Date: 01/25/2022 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 01/25/2022 09:06 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE [1931590] to substitute party filed by National Biodiesel Board in 16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 [Service Date: 01/20/2022 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (Killian, Bryan) [Entered: 01/20/2022 06:22 PM]

Open Document

REPORT [1925993] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status is Notice of Proposal to Address Remand [Service Date: 12/08/2021 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 12/08/2021 07:07 PM]

Open Document

REPORT [1924085] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status [Service Date: 11/26/2021 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 11/26/2021 09:17 AM]

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Order

Open Document #1

Petition for Review

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

197 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT [1956454] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status [Service Date: 07/26/2022 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 07/26/2022 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT [1948328] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status [Service Date: 05/27/2022 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 05/27/2022 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT [1940824] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status [Service Date: 03/28/2022 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 03/28/2022 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT [1932096] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status [Service Date: 01/25/2022 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 01/25/2022 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE [1931590] to substitute party filed by National Biodiesel Board in 16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 [Service Date: 01/20/2022 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (Killian, Bryan) [Entered: 01/20/2022 06:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT [1925993] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status is Notice of Proposal to Address Remand [Service Date: 12/08/2021 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 12/08/2021 07:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT [1924085] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status [Service Date: 11/26/2021 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 11/26/2021 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT [1915706] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status [Service Date: 09/27/2021 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 09/27/2021 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT [1907848] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status [Service Date: 07/27/2021 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 07/27/2021 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT [1900457] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 16-1005, EPA in 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, EPA and Gina McCarthy in 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056 abeyance status [Service Date: 05/28/2021 ] [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047, 16-1049, 16-1050, 16-1053, 16-1054, 16-1056] (McCusker, Caitlin) [Entered: 05/28/2021 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
166 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1598570] submitted by American Coalition for Ethanol, Americans for Clean Energy, Biotechnology Innovation Organization, Growth Energy, National Corn Growers Association, National Sorghum Producers and Renewable Fuels Association [Service Date: 02/11/2016 ] [16-1005] (Waxman, Seth) [Entered: 02/11/2016 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1598569] filed by American Coalition for Ethanol, Americans for Clean Energy, Biotechnology Innovation Organization, Growth Energy, National Corn Growers Association, National Sorghum Producers and Renewable Fuels Association [Service Date: 02/11/2016 ] [16-1005] (Waxman, Seth) [Entered: 02/11/2016 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1598568] filed by American Coalition for Ethanol, Americans for Clean Energy, Biotechnology Innovation Organization, Growth Energy, National Corn Growers Association, National Sorghum Producers and Renewable Fuels Association [Service Date: 02/11/2016 ] [16-1005] (Waxman, Seth) [Entered: 02/11/2016 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1598565] filed by American Coalition for Ethanol, Americans for Clean Energy, Biotechnology Innovation Organization, Growth Energy, National Corn Growers Association, National Sorghum Producers and Renewable Fuels Association [Service Date: 02/11/2016 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [16-1005] (Waxman, Seth) [Entered: 02/11/2016 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1598561] filed by American Coalition for Ethanol, Americans for Clean Energy, Biotechnology Innovation Organization, Growth Energy, National Corn Growers Association, National Sorghum Producers and Renewable Fuels Association [Service Date: 02/11/2016 ] [16-1005] (Waxman, Seth) [Entered: 02/11/2016 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1598558] filed by Seth P. Waxman and co-counsel Edward N. Siskel, David M. Lehn, Robert J. McKeehan, Mark C. Kalpin, and Saurabh Sanghvi on behalf of Petitioners American Coalition for Ethanol, Americans for Clean Energy, Biotechnology Innovation Organization, Growth Energy, National Corn Growers Association, National Sorghum Producers and Renewable Fuels Association. [16-1005] (Waxman, Seth) [Entered: 02/11/2016 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1598431] filed consolidating cases 16-1044, 16-1047 (Consolidation started 02/10/2016) with 16-1005. Directing party to file in 16-1044 and 16-1047 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/11/2016. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/11/2016 [16-1005, 16-1044, 16-1047] [Entered: 02/10/2016 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1598338] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1598336-2 ] [16-1044] [Entered: 02/10/2016 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1598336] filed by Monroe Energy, LLC of a decision by federal agency [Service Date: 02/09/2016 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [16-1044] [Entered: 02/10/2016 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [16-1044] [Entered: 02/10/2016 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Renewable Fuels Association is a litigant

Latest cases where CVR Energy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Monroe Energy, LLC is a litigant