Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/26/2020 at 06:01:52 (UTC).

Monica Hardaway, et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 Monica Hardaway filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-20224

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INCORPORATED

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Breach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-WL1, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-WL1

Plaintiff / Appellants

GLENN HARDAWAY

Katy, TX 77449

MONICA HARDAWAY

Katy, TX 77449

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas George Yoxall

Attorney at Locke Lord, L.L.P.

2200 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Sahar Haidari Shirazi

Attorney at Locke Lord, L.L.P.

600 Travis Street, Jpmorgan Chase Tower

Houston, TX 77002

Christopher Dove Esq.

Attorney at Locke Lord, L.L.P.

600 Travis Street, Jpmorgan Chase Tower

Houston, TX 77002

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Glenn Hardaway

6037 Fry Road

Katy, TX 77449

Monica Hardaway

6037 Fry Road

Katy, TX 77449

 

Court Documents

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/20/2020 for Appellants Glenn Hardaway and Monica Hardaway. [20-20224] (CMB) [Entered: 06/09/2020 03:41 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9327969-1] to the Motion to proceed IFP filed by Appellants Mrs. Monica Hardaway and Mr. Glenn Hardaway in 20-20224 [ # 9323638-2 ] Date of Service: 06/04/2020. [20-20224] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee and Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated [9327969-1] to the Motion filed by Appellants Mrs. Monica Hardaway and Mr. Glenn Hardaway [ # 9323638-2 ] Date of Service: 06/04/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Dove, Shirazi, Yoxall; Appellant Hardaway; US mail - Appellant Hardaway. [20-20224] (Christopher Dove ) [Entered: 06/04/2020 05:00 PM]

Open Document

EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion to proceed IFP [ # 9323638-2 ] filed by Appellants Mr. Glenn Hardaway and Mrs. Monica Hardaway Date of Service: 05/29/2020 [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 06/03/2020 02:48 PM]

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Glenn Hardaway to proceed in forma pauperis [9323638-2] Fee deadline canceled. Date of service: 05/29/2020 [20-20224] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mrs. Monica Hardaway to proceed in forma pauperis [9323638-2]. Date of service: 05/29/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Dove, Shirazi, Yoxall; Appellant Hardaway; US mail - Appellant Hardaway [20-20224] (Monica Hardaway ) [Entered: 05/29/2020 07:40 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-20224] (Sahar Haidari Shirazi ) [Entered: 05/18/2020 03:43 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-20224] (Christopher Dove ) [Entered: 05/18/2020 02:57 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Mrs. Monica Hardaway [ # 9313987-2 ] [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/15/2020 10:30 AM]

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Mrs. Monica Hardaway for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [9313987-2]. Date of service: 05/14/2020 [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/15/2020 08:35 AM]

Open Document

DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 04/29/2020 denying IFP for Appellants Mr. Glenn Hardaway and Mrs. Monica Hardaway. Fee due on 06/03/2020 for Appellants Glenn Hardaway and Monica Hardaway [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/04/2020 11:24 AM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Glenn Hardaway and Mrs. Monica Hardaway [20-20224] (JMW) [Entered: 04/27/2020 08:15 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/20/2020 for Appellants Glenn Hardaway and Monica Hardaway. [20-20224] (CMB) [Entered: 06/09/2020 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-20224] (CMB) [Entered: 06/09/2020 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9327969-1] to the Motion to proceed IFP filed by Appellants Mrs. Monica Hardaway and Mr. Glenn Hardaway in 20-20224 [ # 9323638-2 ] Date of Service: 06/04/2020. [20-20224] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee and Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated [9327969-1] to the Motion filed by Appellants Mrs. Monica Hardaway and Mr. Glenn Hardaway [ # 9323638-2 ] Date of Service: 06/04/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Dove, Shirazi, Yoxall; Appellant Hardaway; US mail - Appellant Hardaway. [20-20224] (Christopher Dove ) [Entered: 06/04/2020 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:18-CV-1062. (Pleadings only) Electronic ROA due on 06/18/2020. [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 06/03/2020 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion to proceed IFP [ # 9323638-2 ] filed by Appellants Mr. Glenn Hardaway and Mrs. Monica Hardaway Date of Service: 05/29/2020 [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 06/03/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL STATUS filed by Appellants Mr. Glenn Hardaway and Mrs. Monica Hardaway in support of the Motion to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Mrs. Monica Hardaway in 20-20224 [ # 9323638-2 ].. [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 06/03/2020 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Glenn Hardaway to proceed in forma pauperis [9323638-2] Fee deadline canceled. Date of service: 05/29/2020 [20-20224] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mrs. Monica Hardaway to proceed in forma pauperis [9323638-2]. Date of service: 05/29/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Dove, Shirazi, Yoxall; Appellant Hardaway; US mail - Appellant Hardaway [20-20224] (Monica Hardaway ) [Entered: 05/29/2020 07:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Sahar Haidari Shirazi for party(s) Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated, in case 20-20224 [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/19/2020 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christopher Dove for party(s) Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated, in case 20-20224 [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/19/2020 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-20224] (Sahar Haidari Shirazi ) [Entered: 05/18/2020 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-20224] (Christopher Dove ) [Entered: 05/18/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Mrs. Monica Hardaway [ # 9313987-2 ] [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/15/2020 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Mrs. Monica Hardaway for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [9313987-2]. Date of service: 05/14/2020 [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/15/2020 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISTRICT COURT ORDER of 04/29/2020 denying IFP for Appellants Mr. Glenn Hardaway and Mrs. Monica Hardaway. Fee due on 06/03/2020 for Appellants Glenn Hardaway and Monica Hardaway [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/04/2020 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9305895-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/04/2020 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Glenn Hardaway and Mrs. Monica Hardaway [20-20224] (JMW) [Entered: 04/27/2020 08:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant