This case was last updated from PACER on 04/02/2019 at 06:09:04 (UTC).

Mongiello's Italian Cheese Spe v. Euro Foods Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 Mongiello's Italian Cheese Spe filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Euro Foods Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-295

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Euro Foods Inc., DBA Citterio USA Corporation

Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc., DBA Formaggio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Michael P. Hartman Esq.

Attorney at Marks, O'Neill, O'Brien, Doherty & Kelly, P.C.

530 Saw Mill River Road

Elmsford, NY 10523

John Appell Esq.

Attorney at John Appell, Esq.

3 West 35Th Street

New York, NY 10001

Walter Patrick Loughlin Esq.

Attorney at Walter P. Loughlin, Esq.

1225 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10128

 

Court Documents

#44

(#44) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc. in 19-295, Appellant Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc. in 19-368, FILED. Service date 02/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2503011] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 02/22/2019 11:56 AM]

#33

No Description Available

#43

(#43) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [42], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc. in 19-295, Appellant Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc. in 19-368, FILED.[2502303] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:30 PM]

#24

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 01/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2487901] [19-295] [Entered: 02/01/2019 06:10 PM]

#47

(#47) AMENDED FORM C, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Euro Foods Inc., FILED. Service date 02/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2505730] [19-295] [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:46 PM]

#53

(#53) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 04/16/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2514375] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 03/11/2019 09:17 AM]

#29

No Description Available

#49

(#49) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Euro Foods Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 05/17/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 03/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2508428] [19-295] [Entered: 03/01/2019 10:43 AM]

#30

No Description Available

#34

No Description Available

#41

(#41) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, in docket numbers 19-295 & 19-368, ASSIGNED.[2500251] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:12 AM]

#52

(#52) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee Euro Foods Inc. in 19-295 Brief due date as 05/17/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 05/17/2019, FILED.[2509007] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:47 PM]

#18

(#18) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/20/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2497595] [19-368] [Entered: 02/15/2019 10:05 AM]

7 #1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 04/16/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2514375] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 03/11/2019 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee Euro Foods Inc. in 19-295 Brief due date as 05/17/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 05/17/2019, FILED.[2509007] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Euro Foods Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 05/17/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 03/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2508428] [19-295] [Entered: 03/01/2019 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) AMENDED FORM C, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Euro Foods Inc., FILED. Service date 02/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2505730] [19-295] [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [ # 43 ], [ # 44 ], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc. in 19-295, Appellant Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc. in 19-368, FILED.[2503076] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 02/22/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ATTORNEY, Walter Patrick Loughlin for Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc., in case 19-368 Walter Patrick Loughlin for Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc., in case 19-295, [ # 44 ], ADDED.[2503070] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 02/22/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc. in 19-295, Appellant Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc. in 19-368, FILED. Service date 02/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2503011] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 02/22/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [42], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc. in 19-295, Appellant Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc. in 19-368, FILED.[2502303] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • (#42) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc. in 19-295, Appellant Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc. in 19-368, FILED. Service date 02/21/2019 by CM/ECF. [2502264] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, in docket numbers 19-295 & 19-368, ASSIGNED.[2500251] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2019
  • (#19) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Euro Foods Inc. in 19-295, FILED. Service date 02/15/2019 by CM/ECF.[2498163] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 02/15/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 03/20/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2497595] [19-368] [Entered: 02/15/2019 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/13/2019 by CM/ECF.[2496140] [19-295] [Entered: 02/13/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CAPTION, Plaintiff's designation was added as Cross-Appellant and the Defendant's designation was added as Cross-Appellee, AMENDED.[2495114] [19-295, 19-368] [Entered: 02/12/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • (#11) NOTE: See lead case, 19-295, containing complete set of docket entries.[2495096] [19-368] [Entered: 02/12/2019 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mongiello's Italian Cheese Specialties, Inc. in 19-368, FILED. [2495083] [19-368, 19-295] [Entered: 02/12/2019 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2487903] [19-295] [Entered: 02/01/2019 06:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • (#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Euro Foods Inc., district court receipt # ANYSDC-16279887, FILED.[2487902] [19-295] [Entered: 02/01/2019 06:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 01/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2487901] [19-295] [Entered: 02/01/2019 06:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Euro Foods Inc., FILED. [2487899] [19-295] [Entered: 02/01/2019 06:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.