This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/14/2022 at 06:16:07 (UTC).

Mondeck v. LineQuest

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 Mondeck filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against LineQuest. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-50185

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Shawn Mondeck, Individually, and for Others Similarly Situated

Garrett Nichols

Defendant / Appellee

LineQuest, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Richard J. Burch

11 Greenway Plaza

Houston, TX 77046-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert Glenn Chadwick Jr.

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, L.L.P.

5851 Legacy Circle

Plano, TX 75025

Timothy B. Soefje

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, L.L.P.

5851 Legacy Circle

Plano, TX 75025

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Shawn Mondeck and Mr. Garrett Nichols [22-50185] (AS) [Entered: 03/15/2022 04:31 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9799746-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 03/31/2022 for Appellants Shawn Mondeck and Garrett Nichols [22-50185] (CAS) [Entered: 03/16/2022 02:59 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50185] (Robert Glenn Chadwick Jr.) [Entered: 03/24/2022 12:59 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary Transcript Order ddl satisfied [22-50185] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Shawn Mondeck and Mr. Garrett Nichols advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 03/30/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Burch; Attorney for Appellee: Chadwick; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Soefje [22-50185] (Richard J. Burch ) [Entered: 03/30/2022 11:45 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Richard J. Burch for Mr. Shawn Mondeck and Mr. Garrett Nichols for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50185] (Richard J. Burch ) [Entered: 03/30/2022 06:52 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/24/2022 for Appellants Shawn Mondeck and Garrett Nichols. [22-50185] (DDL) [Entered: 04/14/2022 08:58 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/24/2022 for Appellants Shawn Mondeck and Garrett Nichols. [22-50185] (DDL) [Entered: 04/14/2022 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-50185] (DDL) [Entered: 04/14/2022 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketUPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. Docketing letter resent to Attorney Timothy Soefje. [22-50185] (CAS) [Entered: 04/05/2022 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Richard J. Burch for Appellant Garrett Nichols in 22-50185, Attorney Richard J. Burch for Appellant Shawn Mondeck in 22-50185 [22-50185] (CAS) [Entered: 03/31/2022 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Richard J. Burch for Mr. Shawn Mondeck and Mr. Garrett Nichols for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50185] (Richard J. Burch ) [Entered: 03/30/2022 06:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 7:19-CV-221. Electronic ROA due on 04/14/2022. [22-50185] (CAS) [Entered: 03/30/2022 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary Transcript Order ddl satisfied [22-50185] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Shawn Mondeck and Mr. Garrett Nichols advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 03/30/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Burch; Attorney for Appellee: Chadwick; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Soefje [22-50185] (Richard J. Burch ) [Entered: 03/30/2022 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert Glenn Chadwick Jr. for party(s) Appellee LineQuest, L.L.C., in case 22-50185 [22-50185] (CAS) [Entered: 03/25/2022 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50185] (Robert Glenn Chadwick Jr.) [Entered: 03/24/2022 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9799746-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 03/31/2022 for Appellants Shawn Mondeck and Garrett Nichols [22-50185] (CAS) [Entered: 03/16/2022 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Shawn Mondeck and Mr. Garrett Nichols [22-50185] (AS) [Entered: 03/15/2022 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less