This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/29/2021 at 06:10:43 (UTC).

Monday Restaurants, et al v. Intrepid Insurance Company, et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Monday Restaurants filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Intrepid Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2462

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Monday Restaurants, on behalf of itself and all other similarly situated

Michael Wong, DMD, P.C., on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated

Andrew Dill, DMD, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated

Amy Varble, DMD, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

Intrepid Insurance Company, an Iowa corporation, doing business as Intrepid Direct Insurancy

Tri-State Insurance of Minnesota

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel S. Levy

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD S. CORNFELD, LLC

Suite 1645, 1010 Market Street

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Alfredo Torrijos

Attorney at ARIAS & OZZELLO

Suite 1400, 6701 Center Drive West

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Richard Steven Cornfeld

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD S. CORNFELD, LLC

Suite 1645, 1010 Market Street

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Mickel Montalban Arias

Attorney at ARIAS & OZZELLO

Suite 1400, 6701 Center Drive West

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Anthony S. Bruning Jr.

Attorney at BRUNING LAW FIRM, LLC

Suite 600, 555 Washington Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Anthony S. Bruning

Attorney at BRUNING LAW FIRM, LLC

Suite 600, 555 Washington Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Ryan L. Bruning

Attorney at BRUNING LAW FIRM, LLC

Suite 600, 555 Washington Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Antonia Ianniello

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Patrick J. Kenny

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1800, 7700 Forsyth Boulevard

Saint Louis, MO 63105

Lauren H. Navarro

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1500, 2345 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-0000

Lisa M. Southerland

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 5056881-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Richard Steven Cornfeld. Brief of Andrew Dill, Monday Restaurants, Amy Varble and Michael Wong due 09/09/2021. Appendix due on 09/09/2021. [5056907] [21-2462] (HAG) [Entered: 07/21/2021 08:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 09/09/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Richard Steven Cornfeld for Appellants Andrew Dill, Monday Restaurants, Amy Varble and Michael Wong w/service 07/20/2021. [5056881] [21-2462] (RSC) [Entered: 07/20/2021 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Monday Restaurants, Andrew Dill, Amy Varble and Michael Wong - w/service 07/15/2021. [5055259] [21-2462] (RSC) [Entered: 07/15/2021 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Monday Restaurants, Andrew Dill, Amy Varble and Michael Wong - Joint Appendix - w/service 07/15/2021 [5055258] [21-2462] (RSC) [Entered: 07/15/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellants Andrew Dill, Amy Varble, Michael Wong and Monday Restaurants. No Transcript[5055255] [21-2462] (RSC) [Entered: 07/15/2021 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Antonia B. Ianniello for Appellees Intrepid Insurance Company and Tri-State Insurance of Minnesota w/service 07/07/2021 [5052711] [21-2462] (AI) [Entered: 07/07/2021 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Andrew Dill, Monday Restaurants, Amy Varble and Michael Wong. - FOR CAL [5052573] [21-2462] (RSC) [Entered: 07/07/2021 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Ryan L Bruning for Appellants Andrew Dill, Monday Restaurants, Amy Varble and Michael Wong w/service 07/02/2021 [5051451] [21-2462] (RLB) [Entered: 07/02/2021 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Anthony S Bruning, Jr. for Appellants Andrew Dill, Monday Restaurants, Amy Varble and Michael Wong w/service 07/02/2021 [5051450] [21-2462] (ASB) [Entered: 07/02/2021 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Anthony S Bruning for Appellants Andrew Dill, Monday Restaurants, Amy Varble and Michael Wong w/service 07/02/2021 [5051447] [21-2462] (ASB) [Entered: 07/02/2021 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Anthony S Bruning, Jr. for Appellants Andrew Dill, Monday Restaurants, Amy Varble and Michael Wong w/service 07/02/2021. **LOCKED - Counsel refiling to individually list all appellants being represented** [5051410] [21-2462]--[Edited to indicate locked 07/02/2021 by HAG] (ASB) [Entered: 07/02/2021 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Ryan L Bruning for Appellants Andrew Dill, Monday Restaurants, Amy Varble and Michael Wong w/service 07/02/2021. **LOCKED - Counsel refiling to individually list all appellants being represented** [5051396] [21-2462]--[Edited to indicate locked 07/02/2021 by HAG] (RLB) [Entered: 07/02/2021 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Daniel S. Levy for Appellants Andrew Dill, Monday Restaurants, Amy Varble and Michael Wong w/service 07/01/2021 [5051278] [21-2462] (DSL) [Entered: 07/01/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Anthony S Bruning for Appellants Monday Restaurants, Andrew Dill, Amy Varble and Michael Wong w/service 07/01/2021 **LOCKED - Counsel refiling to individually list all appellants being represented** [5051276] [21-2462]--[Edited to indicate locked 07/02/2021 by HAG] (ASB) [Entered: 07/01/2021 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Richard S. Cornfeld for Appellants Andrew Dill, Monday Restaurants, Amy Varble and Michael Wong w/service 07/01/2021 [5051273] [21-2462] (RSC) [Entered: 07/01/2021 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/10/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Andrew Dill, Monday Restaurants, Amy Varble and Michael Wong due 08/10/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5050949] [21-2462] (EDG) [Entered: 07/01/2021 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order and Order of Dismissal both dated 6/2/21. [5050947] [21-2462] (EDG) [Entered: 07/01/2021 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5050944] [21-2462] (EDG) [Entered: 07/01/2021 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren H. Navarro

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Antonia B. Ianniello Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick J. Kenny