This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/15/2022 at 06:10:14 (UTC).

Molly Brown, et al v. Madison Reed, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 Molly Brown, filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Madison Reed, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16415

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

MOLLY BROWN

KEPPIE MOORE, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated

AUDREY SHEFFLER

Defendant / Appellee

MADISON REED, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Carlos Ramirez Esquire

Attorney at Reese, LLP

100 W 93Rd Street, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10025

George Granade

Attorney at Reese LLP

8484 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 515

Los Angeles, CA 90211

Michael Reese

Attorney at Reese, LLP

100 W 93Rd Street, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10025

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Amir Nassihi Esquire

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Andrew Chang

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jason Richardson

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Molly Brown, Keppie Moore and Audrey Sheffler Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/23/2022. [12548395] [22-16415] (Granade, George) [Entered: 09/23/2022 06:24 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/24/2022, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12562060] (BLS) [Entered: 10/12/2022 10:36 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 11/22/2022, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [12585447] (BLS) [Entered: 11/10/2022 07:46 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 11/22/2022, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [12585447] (BLS) [Entered: 11/10/2022 07:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/24/2022, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12562060] (BLS) [Entered: 10/12/2022 10:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/23/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12548400]. [22-16415] (AD) [Entered: 09/23/2022 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Molly Brown, Keppie Moore and Audrey Sheffler Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/23/2022. [12548395] [22-16415] (Granade, George) [Entered: 09/23/2022 06:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Molly Brown, Keppie Moore and Audrey Sheffler Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/23/2022. Transcript ordered by 10/17/2022. Transcript due 11/14/2022. Appellants Molly Brown, Keppie Moore and Audrey Sheffler opening brief due 12/27/2022. Appellee Madison Reed, Inc. answering brief due 01/23/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12542363] (JMR) [Entered: 09/16/2022 01:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less