This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/10/2021 at 06:07:25 (UTC).

Mobilize the Message LLC, et al v. Rob Bonta

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 Mobilize the Message LLC filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Rob Bonta. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55855

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

MOBILIZE THE MESSAGE LLC

MOVING OXNARD FORWARD, INC.

STARR COALITION FOR MOVING OXNARD FORWARD

Defendant / Appellee

ROB BONTA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Alan Gura

Attorney at Institute for Free Speech

1150 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 801

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Jose Zelidon-Zepeda

Attorney at AGCA - Office of the California Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#11

#12

#14

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Mobilize the Message LLC, Moving Oxnard Forward, Inc. and Starr Coalition for Moving Oxnard Forward. Date of service: 10/08/2021. [12252983] [21-55855] (Gura, Alan) [Entered: 10/08/2021 10:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Received 6 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 11 ] filed by Rob Bonta. [12235558] (SD) [Entered: 09/22/2021 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 11 ] submitted by Rob Bonta is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12231732] (KT) [Entered: 09/17/2021 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Rob Bonta. Date of service: 09/17/2021. [12231621] [21-55855] (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) [Entered: 09/17/2021 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 6 ] filed by Appellants. [12212623] (SD) [Entered: 08/26/2021 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 7 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellants. [12212359] (LA) [Entered: 08/26/2021 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 6 ] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 7 ] submitted by appellants are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12208246] (KT) [Entered: 08/23/2021 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Mobilize the Message LLC, Moving Oxnard Forward, Inc. and Starr Coalition for Moving Oxnard Forward. Date of service: 08/20/2021. [12207510] [21-55855]--[COURT UPDATE: attached corrected PDF of excerpts of record. 08/23/2021 by KT] (Gura, Alan) [Entered: 08/20/2021 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Mobilize the Message LLC, Moving Oxnard Forward, Inc. and Starr Coalition for Moving Oxnard Forward. Date of service: 08/20/2021. [12207500] [21-55855]--[COURT UPDATE: attached corrected PDF of opening brief. 08/23/2021 by KT] (Gura, Alan) [Entered: 08/20/2021 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12203426] (VS) [Entered: 08/17/2021 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/12/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12200390]. [21-55855] (AD) [Entered: 08/13/2021 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellants Mobilize the Message LLC, Moving Oxnard Forward, Inc. and Starr Coalition for Moving Oxnard Forward Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/12/2021. [12200344] [21-55855] (Gura, Alan) [Entered: 08/12/2021 06:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed August 10, 2021, is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than September 7, 2021; the answering brief is due October 5, 2021 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12198683] (OC) [Entered: 08/11/2021 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [12197994] (RT) [Entered: 08/11/2021 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Moving Oxnard Forward Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda