This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/05/2021 at 06:10:01 (UTC).

Moa Moa, Inc. v. New Moa Collection, et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 Moa Moa, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against New Moa Collection. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-56296

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Appellant

MOA MOA, INC.

Counter Claimant

NEW MOA COLLECTION, a California corporation

Not Yet Classified

WON YOUNG CHANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Scott Shaw

Attorney at Merchant & Gould, P.C.

1801 California Street, Suite 3300

Denver, CO 80202-2654

Samuel G. Brooks

Attorney at Call & Jensen, APC

610 Newport Center Drive, Suite 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Not Yet Classified and Counter Claimant Attorney

James Woo Ahn

Attorney at Ahn Ip Law

12100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 807

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 02/23/2021, 9:30 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11982079] (BLS) [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 01/26/2021, 10:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11933690] (BLS) [Entered: 12/18/2020 06:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/15/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11929072]. [20-56296] (AD) [Entered: 12/15/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Moa Moa, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/15/2020. [11928694] [20-56296] (Shaw, Scott) [Entered: 12/15/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Moa Moa, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/14/2020. Transcript ordered by 01/04/2021. Transcript due 02/02/2021. Appellant Moa Moa, Inc. opening brief due 03/15/2021. Appellees Won Young Chang and New Moa Collection answering brief due 04/14/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11916523] (JBS) [Entered: 12/07/2020 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOA MOA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Woo Ahn