This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:02:07 (UTC).

Mitchell v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Mitchell filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Bank of New York Mellon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-4098

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

DOES 1001-2000

REPURCHASING DOE

STATUTORY BENEFICIARY DOES, 1-1000

Defendant / Appellees

BRAD DEHAAN

LUNDBERG & ASSOCS, PC, a Utah professional corporation

BRIGHAM LUNDBERG

Salt Lake City, UT 84115

HILLARY MCCORMACK

Salt Lake City, UT 84115

NUVENTURE GROUP, LLC, a Utah limited liability company

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, a New York chartered bank

Plaintiff / Appellant

PAULA A. MITCHELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Hillary R. McCormack

Attorney at Lundberg & Associates

3269 South Main Street, Suite 100

Salt Lake City, UT 84115

Brigham James Lundberg

Attorney at Lundberg & Associates

3269 South Main Street, Suite 100

Salt Lake City, UT 84115

Gavin Troy Parkinson

Attorney at Lundberg & Associates

3269 South Main Street, Suite 100

Salt Lake City, UT 84115

John Christian Barlow I

Attorney at John Christian Barlow Law Office

444 East Tabernacle Street, Building B, Suite 201

Saint George, UT 84770

Chandler Poole Thompson

Attorney at Akerman LLP

170 South Main Street, Suite 950

Salt Lake City, UT 84101-1648

Alan Michael Hurst

Attorney at Akerman LLP

170 South Main Street, Suite 950

Salt Lake City, UT 84101-1648

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Douglas R. Short

2290 East 4500 South, Suite 220

Holladay, UT 84117

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10672485] Entry of appearance filed by John Christian Barlow, I for NuVenture Group, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4098] [Entered: 08/21/2019 02:29 PM]

Open Document

[10671815] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's opening brief and appaendix until 09/26/2019 for Paula A. Mitchell. [19-4098] [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:02 PM]

Open Document

[10671134] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance or notice of non-participation now due on 08/26/2019 for NuVenture Group, LLC. [19-4098] [Entered: 08/15/2019 04:04 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10667148] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Gavin Troy Parkinson and Mr. Brigham James Lundberg for Hillary McCormack, Lundberg & Assocs, PC, Brigham Lundberg and Brad DeHaan. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (all parties previously disclosed). Served on 07/31/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4098] [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:17 AM]

Open Document

[10667114] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/31/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/09/2019 for Paula A. Mitchell. [19-4098] [Entered: 07/31/2019 08:45 AM]

Open Document

[10667027] Entry of appearance filed by Hillary R. McCormack for Brad DeHaan, Hillary McCormack, Brigham Lundberg and Lundberg & Assocs, PC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4098] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:25 PM]

Open Document

[10666976] Entry of appearance filed by Alan Michael Hurst and Chandler Poole Thompson for The Bank of New York Mellon. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email [19-4098] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:23 PM]

Open Document

[10666693] Entry of appearance filed by Douglas R. Short for Paula A. Mitchell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4098] [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:51 AM]

Open Document

[10666622] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Paula A. Mitchell. Served on: 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4098] DRS [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:47 PM]

Open Document

[10666617] Docketing statement filed by Paula A. Mitchell. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4098] DRS [Entered: 07/29/2019 07:51 PM]

Open Document #3

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #2

Preliminary Record

Open Document #1

Transmittal letter

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10672485] Entry of appearance filed by John Christian Barlow, I for NuVenture Group, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4098] [Entered: 08/21/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • [10672416] Entry of appearance submitted by John Christian Barlow for Appellee NuVenture Group, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4098] --[Edited 08/21/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 8/21/19] JCB [Entered: 08/21/2019 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • This entry has been removed from the docket. Duplicate filed. [DD] [10671829] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 09/26/2019 for Paula A. Mitchell. [19-4098] [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10671815] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's opening brief and appaendix until 09/26/2019 for Paula A. Mitchell. [19-4098] [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10671134] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance or notice of non-participation now due on 08/26/2019 for NuVenture Group, LLC. [19-4098] [Entered: 08/15/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667850] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 08/12/2019 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-4098] [Entered: 08/02/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • [10667299] Minute order filed - Notice of appearance due on 08/14/2019 for NuVenture Group, LLC. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-4098] [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667148] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Gavin Troy Parkinson and Mr. Brigham James Lundberg for Hillary McCormack, Lundberg & Assocs, PC, Brigham Lundberg and Brad DeHaan. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (all parties previously disclosed). Served on 07/31/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4098] [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667114] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/31/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/09/2019 for Paula A. Mitchell. [19-4098] [Entered: 07/31/2019 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • [10667035] Entry of appearance submitted by Brigham James Lundberg, Gavin Troy Parkinson for Appellees Brad DeHaan, Lundberg & Assocs, PC, Brigham Lundberg and Hillary McCormack for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 07/31/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 7/31/19][19-4098] BJL [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667027] Entry of appearance filed by Hillary R. McCormack for Brad DeHaan, Hillary McCormack, Brigham Lundberg and Lundberg & Assocs, PC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4098] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • [10666997] Entry of appearance submitted by Hillary R. McCormack for Appellees Brad DeHaan, Lundberg & Assocs, PC, Brigham Lundberg and Hillary McCormack for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4098]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] HRM [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666976] Entry of appearance filed by Alan Michael Hurst and Chandler Poole Thompson for The Bank of New York Mellon. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email [19-4098] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • [10666963] Entry of appearance submitted by Chandler P. Thompson and Alan M. Hurst for Appellee The Bank of New York Mellon for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-4098] --[Edited 07/30/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 7/30/19] AMH [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666693] Entry of appearance filed by Douglas R. Short for Paula A. Mitchell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4098] [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • [10666660] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/06/2019 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-4098] [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666622] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Paula A. Mitchell. Served on: 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4098] DRS [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • [10666619] Entry of appearance submitted by Douglas R. Short for Appellant Paula A. Mitchell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4098] --[Edited 07/30/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] DRS [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666617] Docketing statement filed by Paula A. Mitchell. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4098] DRS [Entered: 07/29/2019 07:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663333] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/16/2019 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 07/30/2019 for Paula A. Mitchell. Notice of appearance also due on 07/30/2019 for Brad DeHaan, Brigham Lundberg, Lundberg & Assocs, PC, Hillary McCormack, NuVenture Group, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon [19-4098] [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.