This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/23/2022 at 06:16:14 (UTC).

Mitchell Marbury v. Warden III, et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 Mitchell Marbury filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Warden III. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10916

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MITCHELL MARBURY

Springville, AL 35146-0000

Defendant / Appellees

WARDEN III

WARDEN II

CAPT. CARLA GRAHAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Mitchell Marbury

Attorney at St. Clair CF - Inmate Legal Mail

1000 St Clair Rd

Springville, AL 35146-0000

Warden, St. Clair CF

Attorney at St. Clair CF - Inmate Trust Fund

1000 St Clair Rd

Springville, AL 35146

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Steven Marshall

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave, Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

PLRA-4 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

PLRA Prisoner Case Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

USDC Order DE 66

Open Document

USDC Order Granting appellant Leave to Proceed with Fees NOT Assessed. Filed on 03/25/2022. Docket Entry 70. [Entered: 03/28/2022 01:12 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Mitchell Marbury. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 04/12/2022 04:56 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Mitchell Marbury. [Entered: 04/20/2022 04:36 PM]

Open Document #1

PLRA-8

Open Document #2

Consent Form Filed

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Mitchell Marbury. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/31/2022. [Entered: 04/22/2022 10:22 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Mitchell Marbury. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/31/2022. [Entered: 04/22/2022 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent Form filed by Appellant Mitchell Marbury. [Entered: 04/20/2022 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Mitchell Marbury. [Entered: 04/20/2022 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Mitchell Marbury. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 04/12/2022 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC Order Granting appellant Leave to Proceed with Fees NOT Assessed. Filed on 03/25/2022. Docket Entry 70. [Entered: 03/28/2022 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Mitchell Marbury on 03/24/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid.. [Entered: 03/28/2022 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Marshall