This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2021 at 06:06:15 (UTC).

Missouri Joint Municipal Electric Utility Comm v. GridLiance High Plains LLC

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Missouri Joint Municipal Electric Utility Comm filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GridLiance High Plains LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2942

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

Missouri Joint Municipal Electric Utility Commission

Defendant / Appellant

GridLiance High Plains LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Paul L. Brusati

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1800, 7700 Forsyth Boulevard

Saint Louis, MO 63105

Karrie J. Clinkinbeard

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1500, 2345 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-0000

Lynn Wilson Hursh

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1500, 2345 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-0000

Kevin William Prewitt

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1500, 2345 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-0000

William Ray Price Jr.

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1800, 7700 Forsyth Boulevard

Saint Louis, MO 63105

Jeffrey L. Schultz

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1800, 7700 Forsyth Boulevard

Saint Louis, MO 63105

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Mark W. Brennan

Attorney at BRYAN & CAVE

3800 One Kansas City Place, 1200 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64105-0000

Daniel T. Donovan

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Logan Rutherford

Attorney at BRYAN & CAVE

3800 One Kansas City Place, 1200 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64105-0000

Robert M. Thompson

Attorney at BRYAN & CAVE

3800 One Kansas City Place, 1200 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64105-0000

Holly R. Trogdon

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 5085284-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Logan Rutherford. Brief of GridLiance High Plains LLC due 11/17/2021. Appendix due on 11/17/2021. [5085327] [21-2942] (HAG) [Entered: 10/08/2021 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/17/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Logan Rutherford for Appellant GridLiance High Plains LLC w/service 10/08/2021. [5085284] [21-2942] (LR) [Entered: 10/08/2021 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGE ORDER: Appellee's [ # 5074627-2 ] motion to dismiss the appeal is denied. Appellant's opening brief and appendix are due October 18, 2021. Adp Sep 2021 [5081104] [21-2942] (HAG) [Entered: 09/27/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY to motion [ # 5074627-2 ], response [ # 5078135-2 ] filed by Appellee Missouri Joint Municipal Electric Utility Commission w/service 09/27/2021. [5081103] [21-2942] (WRP) [Entered: 09/27/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Logan Rutherford for Appellant GridLiance High Plains LLC correcting [ # 5078135-2 ] response filed by Attorney. [5078259] [21-2942] (LR) [Entered: 09/20/2021 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOn December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions/responses filed under [Rule 27], certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed response did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your response, [ # 5078135-2 ], submitted by Mr. Logan Rutherford in 21-2942, pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do NOT refile your response. [21-2942] (HAG) [Entered: 09/20/2021 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE in opposition to motion to dismiss case [ # 5074627-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Logan Rutherford for Appellant GridLiance High Plains LLC , w/service 09/20/2021. [5078135] [21-2942] (LR) [Entered: 09/20/2021 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellant GridLiance High Plains LLC. Transcript ordered[5074986] [21-2942] (RMT) [Entered: 09/10/2021 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant GridLiance High Plains LLC - Joint Appendix - w/service 09/10/2021 [5074984] [21-2942] (RMT) [Entered: 09/10/2021 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK LETTER sent to hold briefing schedule in abeyance pending the disposition of appellee's motion to dismiss. [5074730] [21-2942]--[Edited to revise dkt txt 09/09/2021 by HAG] (HAG) [Entered: 09/09/2021 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss case, filed by Attorney Mr. William Ray Price, Jr. for Appellee Missouri Joint Municipal Electric Utility Commission w/service 09/09/2021. [5074627] [21-2942] (WRP) [Entered: 09/09/2021 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketRECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: Teleconference - District Court document #110 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / WMS, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 01/12/2021, No. of Pgs.: 48, Court Reporter: Rankin, Jeannine [5073461] [21-2942] (STL) [Entered: 09/07/2021 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Logan M. Rutherford for Appellant GridLiance High Plains LLC w/service 08/31/2021 [5071496] [21-2942] (LR) [Entered: 08/31/2021 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant GridLiance High Plains LLC. - FOR CAL [5071490] [21-2942] (RMT) [Entered: 08/31/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Robert M. Thompson for Appellant GridLiance High Plains LLC w/service 08/31/2021 [5071484] [21-2942] (RMT) [Entered: 08/31/2021 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Paul L. Brusati for Appellee Missouri Joint Municipal Electric Utility Commission w/service 08/30/2021 [5070783] [21-2942] (PLB) [Entered: 08/30/2021 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 10/06/2021. Appendix due 10/18/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, GridLiance High Plains LLC due 10/18/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5070457] [21-2942] (AEV) [Entered: 08/27/2021 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 7/29/21, Judgment 8/2/21, docket entries, [5070456] [21-2942] (AEV) [Entered: 08/27/2021 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5070454] [21-2942] (AEV) [Entered: 08/27/2021 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Logan M. Rutherford

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert M. Thompson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Thomas Donovan