This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/22/2022 at 06:06:50 (UTC).

Miriam Fultz, et al v. AFSCME, et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Miriam Fultz filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against AFSCME. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1108

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MIRIAM FULTZ

Defendant / Appellees

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, Council 13

GOVERNOR OF PENNSYLVANIA

MICHAEL NEWSOME, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Pennsylvania Office of Administration

BRIAN T. LYMAN, in his official capacities as Chief Accounting Officer for the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and Deputy Secretary for the Office of Comptroller Operations

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Nathan J. McGrath Esq.

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Floor 2, Suite 600B

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Danielle A. Susanj Esq.

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Floor 2, Suite 600B

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ramya Ravindran Esq.

Attorney at Bredhoff & Kaiser

805 15Th Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Amy L. Rosenberger Esq.

Attorney at Willig Williams & Davidson

1845 Walnut Street, 24Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Caleb C. Enerson Esq.

Attorney at Pennsylvania Department of Labor & Industry

651 Boas Street, 10Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17121

Michael J. Scarinci Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Ryan B. Smith Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Nancy A. Walker Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ECF FILER: STATUS REPORT received from Appellant Miriam Fultz. Certificate of Service dated 02/22/2022. Service made by ECF. [22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/22/2022 12:28 PM]

#16

(#16) ECF FILER: Notice filed by Appellant Bradley Barlow in 21-3096, Appellant Frances Biddiscombe in 21-3097, Appellant Miriam Fultz in 22-1108. Certificate of Service dated 02/15/2022. Service made by ECF. [21-3096, 21-3097, 22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/15/2022 04:36 PM]

#15

(#15) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Miriam Fultz advising this court that no transcripts are available. [22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/04/2022 04:11 PM]

#14

(#14) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Miriam Fultz. [22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/04/2022 04:06 PM]

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Miriam Fultz. [22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/04/2022 03:57 PM]

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Miriam Fultz. [22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/04/2022 03:49 PM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Danielle R. Acker Susanj on behalf of Appellant(s) Miriam Fultz; Darleen Dalto; Lucinda Radaker; Lacey Bainbridge; Carol Shaner; Jason Kohute; Kurtis Coates; Lisa Southers; Brittany Zappasodi; Scott Carter; Debra Kerstetter; Ashley Cluck; Blaine Chapman; Barbara Richter. [22-1108] (DAS) [Entered: 02/04/2022 03:45 PM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nathan J. McGrath on behalf of Appellant(s) Miriam Fultz; Darleen Dalto; Lucinda Radaker; Lacey Bainbridge; Carol Shaner; Jason Kohute; Kurtis Coates; Lisa Southers; Brittany Zappasodi; Scott Carter; Debra Kerstetter; Ashley Cluck; Blaine Chapman; Barbara Richter. [22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/04/2022 03:42 PM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ramya Ravindran on behalf of Appellee(s) American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13. [22-1108] (RR) [Entered: 01/26/2022 03:50 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee AFSCME. [22-1108] (ALR) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:03 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Amy L. Rosenberger, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) American Federation of State, Federal and Municipal Employees (AFSCME) Council 13. [22-1108] (ALR) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:02 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J. Scarinci on behalf of Appellee(s) Governor of Pa., Michael Newsome, Brian Lyman. [22-1108] (MJS) [Entered: 01/24/2022 07:40 AM]

#5

(#5) CLERK ORDER. 22-1108 is consolidated with Nos. 21-3096 and 21-3097 for purposes of scheduling, the joint appendix, the appellees' briefs, and disposition. The appellants are not required to file a consolidated brief addressing all appeals, but they are represented by the same counsel and should file a single brief if possible. Cf. 3d Cir. L.A.R. 3.2. The Court strongly disfavors redundant briefing. Because Nos. 21-3096 and 21-3097 are stayed pending Adams, so too is No. 22-1108. The parties must notify the Court when the mandate in Adams has issued. Briefing schedules in these appeals will be issued thereafter. If any party objects to this consolidation and stay order, a motion seeking relief should be filed within fourteen days. [21-3096, 21-3097, 22-1108] (JK) [Entered: 01/21/2022 09:50 AM]

#4

(#4) CLERK ORDER - RULE 4(a)(4) staying case pending disposition of post decision motion(s). (JK) [Entered: 01/21/2022 09:38 AM]

#3

(#3) ORDER (Clerk) for all parties represented by The Fairness Center, Esq. the designated filer shall be Miriam Fultz. (JK) [Entered: 01/21/2022 09:36 AM]

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

1 #3

District Court Order 07/21/2021

#1

Civil Case Docketed

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: STATUS REPORT received from Appellant Miriam Fultz. Certificate of Service dated 02/22/2022. Service made by ECF. [22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/22/2022 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: Notice filed by Appellant Bradley Barlow in 21-3096, Appellant Frances Biddiscombe in 21-3097, Appellant Miriam Fultz in 22-1108. Certificate of Service dated 02/15/2022. Service made by ECF. [21-3096, 21-3097, 22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/15/2022 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Miriam Fultz advising this court that no transcripts are available. [22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/04/2022 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Miriam Fultz. [22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/04/2022 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Miriam Fultz. [22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/04/2022 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Miriam Fultz. [22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/04/2022 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Danielle R. Acker Susanj on behalf of Appellant(s) Miriam Fultz; Darleen Dalto; Lucinda Radaker; Lacey Bainbridge; Carol Shaner; Jason Kohute; Kurtis Coates; Lisa Southers; Brittany Zappasodi; Scott Carter; Debra Kerstetter; Ashley Cluck; Blaine Chapman; Barbara Richter. [22-1108] (DAS) [Entered: 02/04/2022 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nathan J. McGrath on behalf of Appellant(s) Miriam Fultz; Darleen Dalto; Lucinda Radaker; Lacey Bainbridge; Carol Shaner; Jason Kohute; Kurtis Coates; Lisa Southers; Brittany Zappasodi; Scott Carter; Debra Kerstetter; Ashley Cluck; Blaine Chapman; Barbara Richter. [22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/04/2022 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ramya Ravindran on behalf of Appellee(s) American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13. [22-1108] (RR) [Entered: 01/26/2022 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee AFSCME. [22-1108] (ALR) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Amy L. Rosenberger, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) American Federation of State, Federal and Municipal Employees (AFSCME) Council 13. [22-1108] (ALR) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J. Scarinci on behalf of Appellee(s) Governor of Pa., Michael Newsome, Brian Lyman. [22-1108] (MJS) [Entered: 01/24/2022 07:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK ORDER. 22-1108 is consolidated with Nos. 21-3096 and 21-3097 for purposes of scheduling, the joint appendix, the appellees' briefs, and disposition. The appellants are not required to file a consolidated brief addressing all appeals, but they are represented by the same counsel and should file a single brief if possible. Cf. 3d Cir. L.A.R. 3.2. The Court strongly disfavors redundant briefing. Because Nos. 21-3096 and 21-3097 are stayed pending Adams, so too is No. 22-1108. The parties must notify the Court when the mandate in Adams has issued. Briefing schedules in these appeals will be issued thereafter. If any party objects to this consolidation and stay order, a motion seeking relief should be filed within fourteen days. [21-3096, 21-3097, 22-1108] (JK) [Entered: 01/21/2022 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK ORDER - RULE 4(a)(4) staying case pending disposition of post decision motion(s). (JK) [Entered: 01/21/2022 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) for all parties represented by The Fairness Center, Esq. the designated filer shall be Miriam Fultz. (JK) [Entered: 01/21/2022 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 01/21/2022 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Miriam Fultz in District Court No. 1-20-cv-02107. (JK) [Entered: 01/21/2022 09:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOVERNOR OF PENNSYLVANIA is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES LOCAL 619 DISTRICT COUNCIL 36 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy L. Rosenberger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan B. Smith Esq.