This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/02/2021 at 06:01:23 (UTC).

Ministeri v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Ministeri filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1174

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

 

Party Details

Defendant

AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

Defendant / Appellant

RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellee

RENEE MINISTERI, personal representative of the Estate of Anthony Ministeri

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Deborah Higashi Dodge

Attorney at Nystrom Beckman & Paris LLP

1 Marina Park Dr, 15Th Flr

Boston, MA 02210

Colleen C. Cook

Attorney at Smolak & Vaughan LLP

21 High St, Ste 301

North Andover, MA 01845

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Joshua Bachrach

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP

2 Commerce Sq., 2001 Market St St 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Kara G. Thorvaldsen

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

260 Franklin St, 14Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-3112

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Eugene F. Sullivan Jr.

Attorney at Sullivan & Sullivan, LLP

83 Walnut St, Ste 100

Wellesley, MA 02481-0000

Richard J. Sullivan

Attorney at Sullivan & Sullivan, LLP

83 Walnut St, Ste 100

Wellesley, MA 02481-0000

Teresa A. Monroe

Attorney at Monroe Law LLP

90 State St, Ste 700

Albany, NY 12207

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Eugene F. Sullivan, Jr. for Renee Ministeri. [21-1174] (GB) [Entered: 04/16/2021 06:38 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Teresa A. Monroe for Renee Ministeri. [21-1174] (GB) [Entered: 04/02/2021 06:54 AM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Eugene F. Sullivan, Jr. for Appellee Renee Ministeri. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued March 3, 2021. Forwarded to Sullivan & Sullivan, LLP 83 Walnut St Ste 100 Wellesley, MA 02481. [21-1174]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (ATC) [Entered: 03/25/2021 12:49 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 04/01/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Teresa A. Monroe for Renee Ministeri and Eugene F. Sullivan, Jr. for Renee Ministeri. [21-1174] (GB) [Entered: 03/18/2021 06:28 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company filed by Attorney Joshua Bachrach. Certificate of service dated 03/08/2021. [21-1174] (JB) [Entered: 03/08/2021 11:51 AM]

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document #1

Docketing Statement

Open Document #2

Transcript Acknowledgment

Open Document #1

Transcript Order Form

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 03/05/2021. [21-1174] (KGT) [Entered: 03/05/2021 12:44 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company filed by Attorney Kara Thorvaldsen. Certificate of service dated 03/05/2021. [21-1174] (KGT) [Entered: 03/05/2021 12:40 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Eugene F. Sullivan, Jr. for Renee Ministeri. [21-1174] (GB) [Entered: 04/16/2021 06:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Teresa A. Monroe for Renee Ministeri. [21-1174] (GB) [Entered: 04/02/2021 06:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Eugene F. Sullivan, Jr. for Appellee Renee Ministeri. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued March 3, 2021. Forwarded to Sullivan & Sullivan, LLP 83 Walnut St Ste 100 Wellesley, MA 02481. [21-1174]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (ATC) [Entered: 03/25/2021 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 04/01/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Teresa A. Monroe for Renee Ministeri and Eugene F. Sullivan, Jr. for Renee Ministeri. [21-1174] (GB) [Entered: 03/18/2021 06:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company filed by Attorney Joshua Bachrach. Certificate of service dated 03/08/2021. [21-1174] (JB) [Entered: 03/08/2021 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 03/08/2021. [21-1174] (KGT) [Entered: 03/08/2021 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company indicating the following transcript is being ordered: 01/22/2021, Motion Hearing. Transcript due 05/04/2021 from Court Reporter Rachel M. Lopez. [21-1174] (JMK) [Entered: 03/05/2021 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 03/05/2021. [21-1174] (KGT) [Entered: 03/05/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company filed by Attorney Kara Thorvaldsen. Certificate of service dated 03/05/2021. [21-1174] (KGT) [Entered: 03/05/2021 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #61) filed by Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 03/17/2021 . [21-1174] (GB) [Entered: 03/03/2021 07:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company is a litigant