This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/24/2021 at 06:13:48 (UTC).

Minerva Surgical, Inc. v. Hologic, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Minerva Surgical, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hologic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2246

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MINERVA SURGICAL, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

HOLOGIC, INC.

CYTYC SURGICAL PRODUCTS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Ian Robert Liston

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801

Robert N. Hochman

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

Bank One Plaza, 1 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Vera Elson

Attorney at Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati, PC

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Olivia M. Kim Esq.

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

633 West Fifth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Edward Poplawski

Attorney at Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.

633 West 5Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Caroline A. Wong

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

1 S Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Karen L. Pascale Esq.

1000 North King Street, Rodney Square

Wilmington, DE 19801

Matthew Wolf

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

Ryan Casamiquela

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

Marc A. Cohn

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

Assad H. Rajani

Attorney at Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real, 2 Palo Alto Square

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Jennifer Sklenar

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 8 ] filed by Appellant Minerva Surgical, Inc. The opening brief is due 12/09/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [801543] [JCW] [Entered: 09/24/2021 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION of Appellant Minerva Surgical, Inc. to extend the time to 12/09/2021 to file brief. Service: 09/23/2021 by email. [801535] [21-2246] [Robert Hochman] [Entered: 09/23/2021 09:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC and Hologic, Inc.. Service: 09/08/2021 by clerk, email. [797884] [21-2246] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 09/08/2021 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC and Hologic, Inc.. Service: 09/08/2021 by clerk, email. [797883] [21-2246] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 09/08/2021 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Matthew M. Wolf; Jennifer A. Sklenar; Marc A. Cohn; Ryan J. Casamiquela; Assad Rajani as counsel for Appellees Hologic, Inc. and Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC. Service: 09/08/2021 by clerk. [797882] [21-2246] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 09/08/2021 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Minerva Surgical, Inc.. Service: 09/08/2021 by email. [797716] [21-2246] [Robert Hochman] [Entered: 09/08/2021 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Minerva Surgical, Inc.. Service: 09/08/2021 by email. [797714] [21-2246] [Robert Hochman] [Entered: 09/08/2021 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Robert N. Hochman; Caroline A. Wong; Vera M. Elson; Edward G. Poplawski; Olivia M. Kim as counsel for Appellant Minerva Surgical, Inc.. Service: 09/08/2021 by email. [797712] [21-2246] [Robert Hochman] [Entered: 09/08/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/24/2021. [795188] Entry of Appearance is due on 09/08/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/08/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 09/08/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 10/25/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 08/25/2021 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOLOGIC, INC. is a litigant