This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/04/2022 at 06:10:59 (UTC).

Miller v. United States

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Miller filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-4135

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

DAVID L. MILLER

Defendant / Appellant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Reid W. Lambert

Attorney at Strong & Hanni

102 South 200 East, Suite 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Elizabeth Loveridge

102 South 200 East, Suite 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Landon Monte Yost

P.O. Box 683, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0000

Ivan Clay Dale

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 502, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

[10872970] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Ivan Clay Dale for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 11/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4135] [Entered: 11/17/2021 10:08 AM]

Open Document

[10873062] Docketing statement filed by United States of America. Served on 11/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4135] ICD [Entered: 11/17/2021 01:17 PM]

Open Document

[10873600] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by United States of America. Transcript ordered: Argument held on 08/28/2000. Served on: 11/19/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4135] ICD [Entered: 11/19/2021 10:08 AM]

Open Document

[10873752] Entry of appearance filed by Reid W. Lambert for David L. Miller. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y.(Previously disclosed.) Served on 11/19/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-4135] [Entered: 11/19/2021 02:50 PM]

Open Document

[10874109] Notice filed by David L. Miller. Served on 11/22/2021 by email. [21-4135] RWL [Entered: 11/22/2021 03:16 PM]

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Notice ROA Complete

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10877390] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/06/2021. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 01/18/2022 for United States of America. [21-4135] [Entered: 12/06/2021 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket[10877231] Notice filed that the transcript of argument held on 08/28/2020 was filed by Ms. Becky Janke in district court on 11/30/2021. Notice due that record is complete by 12/13/2021 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court. Text only entry; no document attached. [21-4135] [Entered: 12/06/2021 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10876200] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 12/15/2021 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [21-4135] [Entered: 12/01/2021 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10874109] Notice filed by David L. Miller. Served on 11/22/2021 by email. [21-4135] RWL [Entered: 11/22/2021 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10873752] Entry of appearance filed by Reid W. Lambert for David L. Miller. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y.(Previously disclosed.) Served on 11/19/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-4135] [Entered: 11/19/2021 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket[10873745] Entry of appearance submitted by Reid W. Lambert for Appellee David L. Miller for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 11/19/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4135]--[Edited 11/19/2021 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 11/19/21] RWL [Entered: 11/19/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket. [KLP] Needs to be submitted as a notice of appearance. [10873736] Notice filed by David L. Miller. Served on 11/19/2021 by email. [21-4135] RWL [Entered: 11/19/2021 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket[10873715] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 12/03/2021 for Becky Janke. Argument 8/28/20. (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-4135] [Entered: 11/19/2021 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10873600] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by United States of America. Transcript ordered: Argument held on 08/28/2000. Served on: 11/19/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4135] ICD [Entered: 11/19/2021 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10873062] Docketing statement filed by United States of America. Served on 11/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4135] ICD [Entered: 11/17/2021 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10872970] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Ivan Clay Dale for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 11/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4135] [Entered: 11/17/2021 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docket[10872965] Entry of appearance submitted by Ivan C. Dale for Appellant United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 11/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4135] --[Edited 11/17/2021 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] ICD [Entered: 11/17/2021 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10870354] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/05/2021 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 11/19/2021 for United States of America. Notice of appearance also due on 11/19/2021 for David L. Miller. [21-4135] [Entered: 11/05/2021 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ivan C. Dale

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Landon Yost