This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/20/2021 at 06:52:57 (UTC).

Miller v. Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 Miller filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    18-959

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Jeffrey W. Miller

Defendant / Appellees

Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc.

Phoenix Global Resources PLC, FKA Andes Energia PLC

Upstream Latinoamerica, S.L.

Mercuria US Asset Holdings, LLC

Mercuria Energy Asset Management, BV

Mercuria Capital Partners Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Nicole Gueron Esq.

Attorney at Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP

220 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10001

Isaac Zaur Esq.

Attorney at Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP

220 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10001

Brant C. Martin Esq.

Attorney at Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP

100 Throckmorton Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102

David J. Drez Esq. III

Attorney at Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP

100 Throckmorton Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Maaren A. Shah Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Michael Barry Carlinsky

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Nicole Clark Esq.

Attorney at Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP

500 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10110

William Maher

Attorney at Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP

500 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10110

Randall Reese Rainer Esq.

Attorney at Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP

500 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10110

 

Court Documents

#110

(#110) JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[2646960] [18-959] [Entered: 09/04/2019 03:10 PM]

#109

(#109) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2631634] [18-959] [Entered: 08/14/2019 09:23 AM]

106 #3

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_2

106 #2

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_1

106 #1

Summary Order FILED

#104

(#104) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Mercuria Capital Partners Ltd., Mercuria Energy Asset Management, BV, Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc. and Mercuria US Asset Holdings, LLC, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2521872] [18-959] [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:54 AM]

#103

(#103) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Phoenix Global Resources PLC and Upstream Latinoamerica, S.L., FILED. Service date 03/19/2019 by CM/ECF. [2521574] [18-959] [Entered: 03/19/2019 07:07 PM]

#102

(#102) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey W. Miller, FILED. Service date 03/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2520050] [18-959] [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:32 PM]

101 #2

Notice_to_the_BAR

#9

(#11) ATTORNEY, William Maher for Upstream Latinoamerica, S.L. Pheonix Global Resources PLC, in case 18-959 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[2276972] [18-959] [Entered: 04/11/2018 03:39 PM]

#8

(#10) ATTORNEY, Maaren A. Shah for Mercuria Energy Asset Management, BV Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc. Mercuria Capital Partners Ltd. Mercuria US Asset Holdings, LLC, in case 18-959 , [ # 8 ], ADDED.[2276968] [18-959] [Entered: 04/11/2018 03:37 PM]

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Mercuria Capital Partners Ltd., Mercuria Energy Asset Management, BV, Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc. and Mercuria US Asset Holdings, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/11/2018 by CM/ECF.[2276864] [18-959] [Entered: 04/11/2018 03:00 PM]

#6

(#6) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM ORDER, dated 03/05/2018, RECEIVED.[2273923] [18-959] [Entered: 04/06/2018 03:39 PM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/06/2018, RECEIVED.[2273871] [18-959] [Entered: 04/06/2018 03:13 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[2646960] [18-959] [Entered: 09/04/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2631634] [18-959] [Entered: 08/14/2019 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, affirming the March 6, 2018 judgment of the District Court, by JMW, JAC, PWH, FILED.[2631533] [18-959]--[Edited 08/14/2019 by YL] [Entered: 08/14/2019 08:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docket(#105) CASE, before JMW, JAC, PWH, HEARD.[2564699] [18-959] [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Mercuria Capital Partners Ltd., Mercuria Energy Asset Management, BV, Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc. and Mercuria US Asset Holdings, LLC, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2521872] [18-959] [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Phoenix Global Resources PLC and Upstream Latinoamerica, S.L., FILED. Service date 03/19/2019 by CM/ECF. [2521574] [18-959] [Entered: 03/19/2019 07:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey W. Miller, FILED. Service date 03/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2520050] [18-959] [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2519900] [18-959] [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docket(#100) CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 05/15/2019, SET.[2514201] [18-959] [Entered: 03/08/2019 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey W. Miller, in re: advising the Court of availability, RECEIVED. Service date 03/04/2019 by CM/ECF.[2509834] [18-959]--[Edited 03/05/2019 by JW] [Entered: 03/04/2019 05:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY, William Maher for Upstream Latinoamerica, S.L. Pheonix Global Resources PLC, in case 18-959 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[2276972] [18-959] [Entered: 04/11/2018 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY, Maaren A. Shah for Mercuria Energy Asset Management, BV Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc. Mercuria Capital Partners Ltd. Mercuria US Asset Holdings, LLC, in case 18-959 , [ # 8 ], ADDED.[2276968] [18-959] [Entered: 04/11/2018 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Upstream Latinoamerica, S.L. and Pheonix Global Resources PLC, FILED. Service date 04/11/2018 by CM/ECF. [2276932] [18-959] [Entered: 04/11/2018 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Mercuria Capital Partners Ltd., Mercuria Energy Asset Management, BV, Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc. and Mercuria US Asset Holdings, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/11/2018 by CM/ECF. [2276879] [18-959] [Entered: 04/11/2018 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Mercuria Capital Partners Ltd., Mercuria Energy Asset Management, BV, Mercuria Energy Trading, Inc. and Mercuria US Asset Holdings, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/11/2018 by CM/ECF.[2276864] [18-959] [Entered: 04/11/2018 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey W. Miller, USCA receipt # 0208-14903804, FILED.[2273877] [18-959] [Entered: 04/06/2018 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM ORDER, dated 03/05/2018, RECEIVED.[2273923] [18-959] [Entered: 04/06/2018 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2273879] [18-959] [Entered: 04/06/2018 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/06/2018, RECEIVED.[2273871] [18-959] [Entered: 04/06/2018 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey W. Miller, FILED. [2273837] [18-959] [Entered: 04/06/2018 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall R. Rainer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maaren Alia Shah

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Barry Carlinsky