This case was last updated from PACER on 05/13/2019 at 06:22:49 (UTC).

Mildred Crowder v. City of Manila, Arkansas, et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 Mildred Crowder filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Manila, Arkansas. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1527

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Mildred Crowder, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Johnson, Deceased other Timothy Johnson

Defendant / Appellees

Jackie Hill, Individually

Jarad Camp, Individually

City of Manila, Arkansas

Jared Camp, Individually

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Morris W. Thompson

Attorney at MORRIS W. THOMPSON LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 662

Little Rock, AR 72203-0000

Terrence Cain

208 Brown

Little Rock, AR 72205-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Gabrielle Denise Gibson

Attorney at ARKANSAS MUNICIPAL LEAGUE

301 W. Second Street, P.O. Box 38

North Little Rock, AR 72115-0000

John Lennon Wilkerson

Attorney at ARKANSAS MUNICIPAL LEAGUE

301 W. Second Street, P.O. Box 38

North Little Rock, AR 72115-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Orders dated 01/11/2019 and 02/06/2019, Judgment dated 01/11/2019 [4766638] [19-1527] (RLS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:40 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/07/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Terrence Cain for Appellant Mildred Crowder w/service 04/22/2019. [4779915] [19-1527] (TC) [Entered: 04/22/2019 11:12 AM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4766628] [19-1527] (RLS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:29 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mildred Crowder. No Transcript[4771986] [19-1527] (TC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 08:14 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 04/23/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Mildred Crowder due 04/23/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4766640] [19-1527] (RLS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:42 AM]

Open Document

ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Mildred Crowder , w/service 05/07/2019 [4785393] [19-1527] (LMT) [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:30 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by John Wilkerson for Appellees Jarad Camp, City of Manila, Arkansas and Jackie Hill w/service 03/18/2019 [4767783] [19-1527] (JLW) [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:24 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Gabrielle Gibson for Appellees Jarad Camp, City of Manila, Arkansas and Jackie Hill w/service 03/18/2019 [4767788] [19-1527] (GDG) [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:36 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4779915-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Terrence Cain. Brief of Mildred Crowder due 05/07/2019. Appendix due on 05/07/2019. [4780043] [19-1527] (LMT) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:24 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mildred Crowder. w/service 05/07/2019 , Length: 10,805 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Mildred Crowder due 05/13/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs . Brief of Jared Camp, City of Manila, Arkansas and Jackie Hill due on 06/07/2019 [4785408] [19-1527] (LMT) [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:49 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mildred Crowder - w/service 03/28/2019. [4771987] [19-1527] (TC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 08:37 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mildred Crowder - Joint Appendix - w/service 03/28/2019 [4771983] [19-1527] (TC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 08:00 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Terrence Cain for Appellant Mildred Crowder w/service 03/27/2019 [4771470] [19-1527] (TC) [Entered: 03/27/2019 05:30 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mildred Crowder. w/service 04/04/2019 [4774341] [19-1527] (TC) [Entered: 04/04/2019 08:21 PM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mildred Crowder. w/service 05/07/2019 , Length: 10,805 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Mildred Crowder due 05/13/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs . Brief of Jared Camp, City of Manila, Arkansas and Jackie Hill due on 06/07/2019 [4785408] [19-1527] (LMT) [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Mildred Crowder , w/service 05/07/2019 [4785393] [19-1527] (LMT) [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT brief of Mildred Crowder submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4785333] [19-1527] (TC) [Entered: 05/07/2019 05:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mildred Crowder. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4785224] [19-1527] (TC) [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4779915-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Terrence Cain. Brief of Mildred Crowder due 05/07/2019. Appendix due on 05/07/2019. [4780043] [19-1527] (LMT) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/07/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Terrence Cain for Appellant Mildred Crowder w/service 04/22/2019. [4779915] [19-1527] (TC) [Entered: 04/22/2019 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mildred Crowder. w/service 04/04/2019 [4774341] [19-1527] (TC) [Entered: 04/04/2019 08:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mildred Crowder - w/service 03/28/2019. [4771987] [19-1527] (TC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 08:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mildred Crowder. No Transcript[4771986] [19-1527] (TC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 08:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mildred Crowder - Joint Appendix - w/service 03/28/2019 [4771983] [19-1527] (TC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 08:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Terrence Cain for Appellant Mildred Crowder w/service 03/27/2019 [4771470] [19-1527] (TC) [Entered: 03/27/2019 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 19-1527: paid - cs] Paid to dist ct 3/13/19. [4768288] [19-1527] (RLS) [Entered: 03/19/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Gabrielle Gibson for Appellees Jarad Camp, City of Manila, Arkansas and Jackie Hill w/service 03/18/2019 [4767788] [19-1527] (GDG) [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by John Wilkerson for Appellees Jarad Camp, City of Manila, Arkansas and Jackie Hill w/service 03/18/2019 [4767783] [19-1527] (JLW) [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 04/23/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Mildred Crowder due 04/23/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4766640] [19-1527] (RLS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Orders dated 01/11/2019 and 02/06/2019, Judgment dated 01/11/2019 [4766638] [19-1527] (RLS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4766628] [19-1527] (RLS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.