This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:51 (UTC).

Mike Sarieddine v. Alien Visions E-Juice, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Mike Sarieddine filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Alien Visions E-Juice, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55808

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

MIKE SARIEDDINE, an individual

Defendant / Appellant

ALIEN VISIONS E-JUICE, INC., a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Bruno Tarabichi

Attorney at Owens Tarabichi LLP

111 N. Market Street, Suite 730

San Jose, CA 95113

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Amanda Groover Hyland

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Kelly Casey Mullally

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Seth Kincaid Trimble

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

#4

(#4) Filed order MEDIATION (CG): The briefing schedules previously established by the court are vacated. These appeals shall be briefed as cross-appeals. Plaintiff shall file his opening brief on or before October 7, 2019. Defendants opening/answering brief is due November 6, 2019. Plaintiffs answering/reply brief is due December 6, 2019. Defendants optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of the answering/reply brief. This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11414171] [19-55478, 19-55808] (JMR) [Entered: 08/28/2019 03:51 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Alien Visions E-Juice, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/18/2019. [11368223] [19-55808] (Hyland, Amanda) [Entered: 07/18/2019 01:28 PM]

1 #2

Mediation Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed order MEDIATION (CG): The briefing schedules previously established by the court are vacated. These appeals shall be briefed as cross-appeals. Plaintiff shall file his opening brief on or before October 7, 2019. Defendants opening/answering brief is due November 6, 2019. Plaintiffs answering/reply brief is due December 6, 2019. Defendants optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of the answering/reply brief. This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11414171] [19-55478, 19-55808] (JMR) [Entered: 08/28/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/18/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11368910][19-55808] (AD) [Entered: 07/18/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Alien Visions E-Juice, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/18/2019. [11368223] [19-55808] (Hyland, Amanda) [Entered: 07/18/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/23/2019. Appellant Alien Visions E-Juice, Inc. opening brief due 09/13/2019. Appellee Mike Sarieddine answering brief due 10/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11364687] (RT) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.