This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/15/2019 at 06:03:03 (UTC).

Mike Campbell v. Representative Cheri Reisch

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Mike Campbell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Representative Cheri Reisch. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2994

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

Mike Campbell

Defendant / Appellant

Representative Cheri Toalson Reisch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

John Andrew Hirth

Attorney at TGH LITIGATION LLC

Suite 500, 28 N. Eighth Street

Columbia, MO 65201

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Lowell D. Pearson

Attorney at HUSCH & BLACKWELL

Suite 300, 235 E. High Street

Jefferson City, MO 65101-0000

Michael T. Raupp

Attorney at HUSCH & BLACKWELL

Suite 1000, 4801 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64112

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4847883-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Michael T. Raupp. Brief of Cheri Toalson Reisch due 12/05/2019. Appendix due on 12/05/2019. [4847922] [19-2994] (AMT) [Entered: 10/31/2019 04:17 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 12/05/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Michael T. Raupp for Appellant Ms. Cheri Toalson Reisch w/service 10/31/2019. [4847883] [19-2994] (MTR) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:17 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Ms. Cheri Toalson Reisch. w/service 09/30/2019 [4836296] [19-2994] (MTR) [Entered: 10/01/2019 09:16 AM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Ms. Cheri Toalson Reisch - Joint Appendix - w/service 09/30/2019 [4836142] [19-2994] (MTR) [Entered: 09/30/2019 05:04 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Michael T. Raupp for Appellant Ms. Cheri Toalson Reisch w/service 09/30/2019 [4836125] [19-2994] (MTR) [Entered: 09/30/2019 04:31 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 10/28/2019. Appendix due 11/05/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Cheri Toalson Reisch due 11/05/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4831236] [19-2994] (AEV) [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:09 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law 7/16/19, Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law 8/16/19, docket entries, [4831232] [19-2994] (AEV) [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:06 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4831229] [19-2994] (AEV) [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:03 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • RECORD FILED - TRIAL TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case, Source Location: USDC / WMJC, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 04/19/2019, No. of Pgs.: 74, Court Reporter: Wirt, Kathleen [4851282] [19-2994] (STL) [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4847883-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Michael T. Raupp. Brief of Cheri Toalson Reisch due 12/05/2019. Appendix due on 12/05/2019. [4847922] [19-2994] (AMT) [Entered: 10/31/2019 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 12/05/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Michael T. Raupp for Appellant Ms. Cheri Toalson Reisch w/service 10/31/2019. [4847883] [19-2994] (MTR) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Ms. Cheri Toalson Reisch. w/service 09/30/2019 [4836296] [19-2994] (MTR) [Entered: 10/01/2019 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Ms. Cheri Toalson Reisch - Joint Appendix - w/service 09/30/2019 [4836142] [19-2994] (MTR) [Entered: 09/30/2019 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Michael T. Raupp for Appellant Ms. Cheri Toalson Reisch w/service 09/30/2019 [4836125] [19-2994] (MTR) [Entered: 09/30/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 10/28/2019. Appendix due 11/05/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Cheri Toalson Reisch due 11/05/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4831236] [19-2994] (AEV) [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law 7/16/19, Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law 8/16/19, docket entries, [4831232] [19-2994] (AEV) [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4831229] [19-2994] (AEV) [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael T. Raupp