This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/04/2020 at 05:35:32 (UTC).

Micron Technology, Inc. v. North Star Innovations, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 Micron Technology, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against North Star Innovations, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1303

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC.

Appellee

NORTH STAR INNOVATIONS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Jeremy Jason Lang

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Appellee Attorney

Philip Levy

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

600 Grant Street, 44Th Floor, Usx Tower

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 12/26/2019. [659714] Entry of Appearance due 01/14/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/14/2020. Docketing Statement due 01/14/2020. Certified List due on 02/10/2020. [TAM] [Entered: 12/31/2019 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH STAR INNOVATIONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Levy