Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2020 at 06:06:58 (UTC).

Michelle Moriarty v. Bayside Insurance Associates, et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 Michelle Moriarty filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Bayside Insurance Associates. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-56139

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

AMERICAN GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Texas Corporation

DOES, 1 thru 20 Inclusive

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHELLE L. MORIARTY, Individually, as Successor-In-Interest to Heron D. Moriarty, Decedent, on Behalf of the Estate of Heron D. Moriarty, and on Behalf of the Class

Defendant / Appellee

BAYSIDE INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, INC., a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Craig Nicholas

Attorney at Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP

225 Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Sarah Ball

Attorney at Winters & Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Shaun Markley

Attorney at Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP

225 Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Georg M. Capielo

Attorney at Winters & Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Jack B. Winters Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Winters & Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Alex Tomasevic

Attorney at Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP

225 Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jeffrey Mark Byer Esquire

Attorney at SANDLER LARSY LAUBE BYER and VALDEZ

402 W. Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101-3542

Jeffrey Mark Byer

Attorney at SANDLER LASRY LAUBE BYER & VALDEZ, LLP

402 W. Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101-3542

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ appellee only, 12/18/2020, 12:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11924339] (BLS) [Entered: 12/11/2020 12:40 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ appellee only, 12/08/2020, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. 12/9/2020 - STATUS REPORT due from appellant. See order for details. [11912661] (BLS) [Entered: 12/02/2020 01:19 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 12/01/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11896868] (BLS) [Entered: 11/18/2020 07:09 AM]

2 #3

Additional Document

#2

Additional Document

2 #1

Main Document

1 #5

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ appellee only, 12/18/2020, 12:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11924339] (BLS) [Entered: 12/11/2020 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docket(#7) Streamlined request [6] by Appellant Michelle L. Moriarty to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Michelle L. Moriarty opening brief due 01/27/2021. Appellee Bayside Insurance Associates, Inc. answering brief due 02/26/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11922725] (BG) [Entered: 12/10/2020 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Michelle L. Moriarty. New requested due date is 01/27/2021. [11922239] [20-56139] (Winters, Jack) [Entered: 12/10/2020 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ appellee only, 12/08/2020, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. 12/9/2020 - STATUS REPORT due from appellant. See order for details. [11912661] (BLS) [Entered: 12/02/2020 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 12/01/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11896868] (BLS) [Entered: 11/18/2020 07:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/03/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11881203]. [20-56139] (AD) [Entered: 11/03/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Michelle L. Moriarty Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/03/2020. [11880953] [20-56139]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached correct PDF of proof of service. 11/02/2020 by SLM] (Winters, Jack) [Entered: 11/03/2020 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Michelle L. Moriarty Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/05/2020. Appellant Michelle L. Moriarty opening brief due 12/28/2020. Appellee Bayside Insurance Associates, Inc. answering brief due 01/27/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11875400] (JBS) [Entered: 10/29/2020 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American General Life Insurance Company is a litigant