This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2019 at 06:11:01 (UTC).

Michelle Helm v. Greg Carroll, et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 Michelle Helm filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Greg Carroll. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11569

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Plaintiff / Appellee

MICHELLE LEE HELM, Individually and as Guardian and next firend of TDH, a minor child

Defendant / Appellants

GEORGE MORRIS, Individually and in his official capacity as a member of the Rainbow City Police Department

JAMES FAZAKAS, Individually and in his official capacity as a member of the Rainbow City Police Department

TIMOTHY KIMBROUGH

GREG CARROLL, Chief of Police, Rainbow City, Alabama

JUSTIN GILLILAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Howard Edgar Howard

Attorney at Ford Howard & Cornett, PC

Po Box 388

Gadsden, AL 35902

Thomas Summers Hale

Attorney at Hale Sides, LLC

600 Financial Ctr, 505 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Hoyt Gregory Harp

Attorney at Environmental Litigation Group, PC

3529 7Th Ave S

Birmingham, AL 35222-3210

Moses O. Stone

Attorney at Stone Law Firm, LLC

205 20Th St N Ste 315, Po Box 461

Birmingham, AL 35201

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Charles David Stubbs

Attorney at Stubbs Sills & Frye, PC

1724 S Quintard Ave

Anniston, AL 36202

Allison B. Chandler

Attorney at F&B Law Firm, PC

213 Greene St

Huntsville, AL 35801

Allen L. Anderson

Attorney at F&B Law Firm, PC

213 Greene St

Huntsville, AL 35801

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION to file appendix filed by Justin Gilliland. Motion is Unopposed. [8805376-1] [19-11569] (ECF: Allen Anderson) [Entered: 06/20/2019 11:59 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Moses O. Stone for Michelle Lee Helm. [19-11569] (ECF: Moses Stone) [Entered: 05/29/2019 05:24 PM]

Open Document

Returned Mail was received for Attorney Hoyt Gregory Harp for Appellee Michelle Lee Helm. IN RE: Second Briefing Notice [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:16 AM]

Open Document

Returned Mail was received for Attorney Hoyt Gregory Harp for Appellee Michelle Lee Helm. IN RE: Briefing Notice [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:12 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Charles David Stubbs for Appellants Greg Carroll, James Fazakas, Timothy Kimbrough and George Morris. No hearings. [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:43 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Charles David Stubbs for Appellants Greg Carroll, James Fazakas, Timothy Kimbrough and George Morris. No hearings. [19-11569] (ECF: Charles Stubbs) [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:22 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Allen L. Anderson for Appellant Justin Gilliland. No hearings. [Entered: 05/03/2019 09:39 AM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Allen L. Anderson for Appellant Justin Gilliland. [19-11569] (ECF: Allen Anderson) [Entered: 05/02/2019 04:42 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Allen L. Anderson for Appellant Justin Gilliland. No hearings. [19-11569] (ECF: Allen Anderson) [Entered: 05/02/2019 04:18 PM]

Open Document #2

Appearance of Counsel Form Filed

Open Document #1

Appearance of Counsel Form Filed

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allen L. Anderson for Justin Gilliland Attorney Allen L. Anderson for Appellant Justin Gilliland. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11569] (ECF: Allen Anderson) [Entered: 05/02/2019 04:11 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Charles David Stubbs for Appellants Greg Carroll, James Fazakas, Timothy Kimbrough and George Morris. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11569] (ECF: Charles Stubbs) [Entered: 04/29/2019 12:12 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Charles David Stubbs for Appellants Greg Carroll, James Fazakas, Timothy Kimbrough and George Morris. [19-11569] (ECF: Charles Stubbs) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:46 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Charles David Stubbs for Greg Carroll, James Fazakas, Timothy Kimbrough and George Morris. [19-11569] (ECF: Charles Stubbs) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:19 AM]

Open Document #4

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

DC Order dE #114

Open Document #2

DC Order DE #113

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to file appendix filed by Justin Gilliland. Motion is Unopposed. [8805376-1] [19-11569] (ECF: Allen Anderson) [Entered: 06/20/2019 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Moses O. Stone for Michelle Lee Helm. [19-11569] (ECF: Moses Stone) [Entered: 05/29/2019 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Returned Mail was received for Attorney Hoyt Gregory Harp for Appellee Michelle Lee Helm. IN RE: Second Briefing Notice [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Returned Mail was received for Attorney Hoyt Gregory Harp for Appellee Michelle Lee Helm. IN RE: Briefing Notice [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Charles David Stubbs for Appellants Greg Carroll, James Fazakas, Timothy Kimbrough and George Morris. No hearings. [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Charles David Stubbs for Appellants Greg Carroll, James Fazakas, Timothy Kimbrough and George Morris. No hearings. [19-11569] (ECF: Charles Stubbs) [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Allen L. Anderson for Appellant Justin Gilliland. No hearings. [Entered: 05/03/2019 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Allen L. Anderson for Appellant Justin Gilliland. [19-11569] (ECF: Allen Anderson) [Entered: 05/02/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Allen L. Anderson for Appellant Justin Gilliland. No hearings. [19-11569] (ECF: Allen Anderson) [Entered: 05/02/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Allison B. Chandler for Justin Gilliland and Allen L. Anderson for Justin Gilliland. [19-11569] (ECF: Allen Anderson) [Entered: 05/02/2019 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allen L. Anderson for Justin Gilliland Attorney Allen L. Anderson for Appellant Justin Gilliland. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11569] (ECF: Allen Anderson) [Entered: 05/02/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Charles David Stubbs for Appellants Greg Carroll, James Fazakas, Timothy Kimbrough and George Morris. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11569] (ECF: Charles Stubbs) [Entered: 04/29/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Charles David Stubbs for Appellants Greg Carroll, James Fazakas, Timothy Kimbrough and George Morris. [19-11569] (ECF: Charles Stubbs) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Charles David Stubbs for Greg Carroll, James Fazakas, Timothy Kimbrough and George Morris. [19-11569] (ECF: Charles Stubbs) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Greg Carroll, James Fazakas, Timothy Kimbrough and George Morris on 04/24/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/03/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/08/2019 as to Appellant Greg Carroll. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/22/2019 as to Appellee Michelle Lee Helm [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.