This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/27/2020 at 06:19:28 (UTC).

Michael Wilson v. Mount Diablo Unified School, et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 Michael Wilson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Mount Diablo Unified School,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-16674

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CHRISTINE L. WILBURN

SEAN JAMES BIAS

STEPHANIE R.C. KANG

MANDY GINA LEIGH

CHERYL HANSEN

DIANA B. BECTON

BENJAMIN SAMUEL CAMPOPIANO

MOUNT DIABLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT/SPECIAL EDUCATION LOCAL PLAN AREA (DIABLO)

CONTRA COSTA COUNTY OFFICE OF EDUCATION, (CCCOE)

MARGERY DORISE RUSSELL

RICHARD JACKSON

CRAIG MICHAEL BROOKS

MICHAEL A. JIMENEZ

BETH ANN JOHNSON

DEBRA ANN MAHER

SEAN R. ERIKSEN

SEAN PATRICK DONNELLY

DOMINIC EFRAIN MEDINA

JEFFREY COLIN HAGERSTRAND

LEE LAWRENCE

103 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Damien Troutman Esquire

Attorney at Leigh Law Group, P.C.

870 Market Street, Suite 1157

San Francisco, CA 94102

Jay T. Jambeck

Attorney at Leigh Law Group, P.C.

870 Market Street, Suite 1157

San Francisco, CA 94102

Louis Leone Esquire

Attorney at STUBBS & LEONE

2175 N. California Blvd.

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Seth Gordon Esquire

Attorney at Leone & Alberts

2175 N. California Boulevard, Suite 900

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Jimmie Emile Johnson Esquire

Attorney at Leone & Alberts

2175 N. California Boulevard, Suite 900

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Other Attorneys

Damon M. Thurston Esquire

Attorney at Rankin, Sproat, Mires, Beaty & Reynolds

1970 Broadway

Oakland, CA 94612

Michael Geary Wilson

818 Tampico

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

Additional Document

4 #3

Additional Document

4 #2

Additional Document

4 #1

Main Document

#3

#2

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#14) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 20-16674: Due] ). [11856205] (CO) [Entered: 10/13/2020 12:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Date of service: 10/10/2020. [11855078] [20-16674] (Wilson, Michael) [Entered: 10/10/2020 07:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson response to order to show cause dated 09/09/2020. Date of service: 10/10/2020. [11855077] [20-16674] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 10/13/2020 by TYL] (Wilson, Michael) [Entered: 10/10/2020 07:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DA): Appellants motions to consolidate (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 5 ], [ # 6 ]) are denied. The briefing schedule remains stayed for this appeal No. 20-16674 pending disposition of the courts September 9, 2020 order. [11839604] (JMR) [Entered: 09/28/2020 03:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson Correspondence: WILSONS NOTICE RE THIS COURTS SUPERVISORY MANDAMUS JURISDICTION IN 20-16467, 20-16470, 20-16521, 20-16523, 20-16525, 20-16531, 20-16536, 20-16537, 20-16630, 20-16674, 20-16738, and 20-16782. Date of service: 09/18/2020 [11829229] [20-16674] (Wilson, Michael) [Entered: 09/18/2020 12:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#9) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/17/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11828500]. [20-16674] (AD) [Entered: 09/17/2020 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/17/2020. [11828489] [20-16674] (Wilson, Michael) [Entered: 09/17/2020 06:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson Correspondence: WILSONS 9/17/2020 CERTIFICATE THAT NO TRANSCRIPT WILL BE ORDERED. Date of service: 09/17/2020 [11828487] [20-16674] (Wilson, Michael) [Entered: 09/17/2020 06:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson Amended Motion to consolidate cases 20-16467, 20-16470, 20-16521, 20-16523, 20-16525, 20-16531, 20-16536, 20-16537, 20-16630, 20-16674, 20-16738, 20-16782. Date of service: 09/16/2020. [11826447] [20-16674] (Wilson, Michael) [Entered: 09/16/2020 01:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson Amended Motion to consolidate cases 20-16467, 20-16470, 20-16521, 20-16523, 20-16525, 20-16531, 20-16536, 20-16537, 20-16630, 20-16674, 20-16738. Date of service: 09/15/2020. [11825482] [20-16674] (Wilson, Michael) [Entered: 09/15/2020 08:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court has certified that this appeal is not taken in good faith and has revoked appellants in forma pauperis status. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellee may file a response within 10 days after service of appellants statement. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [11817705] (CKP) [Entered: 09/09/2020 01:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received copy of District Court order filed on 09/04/2020 certifying appeal not taken in good faith; revoking in forma pauperis status. [11816332] (QDL) [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11812486] (CKP) [Entered: 09/03/2020 01:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Michael Geary Wilson opening brief due 10/26/2020. Appellees Nooria Achakzai, Admiral Security Services, Inc., Wendi Susan Aghily, Lori Marian Amenta, Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo, Sandra Kay Barnhart, Diana B. Becton, Yvonne Lynette Benitez, Sean James Bias, Shane Michael Blatz, Craig Michael Brooks, Dustin James Brookshire, R. Burnell, Roger Clifford Bylund, Benjamin Samuel Campopiano, Carol Lynn Casidy, Thomas Edward Chaplin, City of Concord, City of Pleasant Hill, City of Walnut Creek, Kyle Andrew Colvin, Roy Albert Combs, Sean Michael Conley, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County Office of Education, Contra Costa County Superior Court, State of California, Deborah A. Cooksey, Kelly R. Cooper, Michael Thomas Czyz, James A. Davis Jr., Sean Patrick Donnelly, David F. Downs, Joanne L. Durker, Seth Nathaniel Eckstein, Christina Marie Ensley, Sean R. Eriksen, Jose A. Espinoza, Elizabeth Ann Estes, Johnny Y. Estrada, Joseph Gerard Estrada, Mark D. Evans, Peter Kirk Fagen, Fagen, Friedman & Fulfrost, LLP, Female CPD Employee 3172, Jonathan Michael Fey, Howard Jay Fulfrost, Kathleen Hanau Gaines, Summer Maureen Galer, John A. Garcia, Mary Ann Grubb, Jeffrey Colin Hagerstrand, Cheryl Hansen, Ryan Michael Hibbs, James Hoak, Christopher Joseph Holleran, Clifton Edward Huffmaster, Christine Anell Huntoon, Richard Jackson, Jay T. Jambeck, Michael A. Jimenez, John Muir Health, Beth Ann Johnson, Bruce Wayne Jower, Laura Maureen Juranek, Stephanie R.C. Kang, Tamara Denise Kast, Cherise Marie Khaund, Terry William Koehne, Jeffrey Michael Krieger, Shanna Gage Lai, Brian Thomas Lawrence, Lee Lawrence, Mandy Gina Leigh, Leigh Law Group, P.C., Andrew David Lingua, David O. Livingston, Gregory A. Mahan, Debra Ann Maher, Debra L. Mason, Linda Kaye Mayo, Michael Glenn McAlister, Dominic Efrain Medina, Nellie Eileen Meyer, Jim Miller, Scott Brian Moorhouse, Diane Patricia Morrell, Mount Diablo Unified School District/Special Education Local Plan Area (Diablo), Paul Richard Mulligan, Derek Hall Murdock, Melissa R. Murphy, Lisa Angell Murphy-Oates, Katan Nanthasiri, Angelica Navarro, Andrew James Olson, Michael Plummer, Rosenda Flores Ramos, Rosanne Marie Reid, Fraser Grant Ritchie, Ricky Allen Rivera, Michael W. Roberts, Margery Dorise Russell, Jesse Ray Rutland, Jennifer G. Sachs, Darryl R. Saffold, Karen Shigezumi Sakata, Jesse Savage, Lawrence Michael Schoenke, Gary Silva, Christopher J. Souza, Mark Andrew Souza, Todd Wayne Stroud, Guy Anthony Swanger, Damien Troutman, Steven A. Valkanoff, Michael J. Watson, Daniel John Wedemeyer, Edward George Weil, Mike Westfield, Christine L. Wilburn, Alicia D. Williams, Margaret Wood and Jeannine Marie Yore answering brief due 11/23/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11806434] (JMR) [Entered: 08/28/2020 02:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less