This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/14/2023 at 11:01:34 (UTC).

Michael Wilson v. County of Contra Costa, et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Michael Wilson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Contra Costa,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-16630

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA

JOHN MUIR HEALTH

BRADLEY DAVIS

RANKIN, SHUEY, RANUCCI, MINTZ, LAMPASONA & REYNOLDS, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

LAURIE SMITH, Sheriff

DAMIEN TROUTMAN

LEIGH LAW GROUP, P.C.

JAMES HELMS

MANDY GINA LEIGH

COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA, et al.

MARIA MARGARITE LAMPASONA

NATALIE BROWN

SHAWN FRANCIS

JOHN WILLIAM RANUCCI

MICHAEL RENE REYNOLDS

DAVID TODD SHUEY

MARIO PEREZ

JAY T. JAMBECK

CALVIN KNIGHT

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHAEL GEARY WILSON

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Claire Truxaw Cormier Esquire

Damon M. Thurston Esquire

Damien Troutman Esquire

Jay T. Jambeck

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael Geary Wilson

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

#12

#15

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: OC) Dismissing case for failure to prosecute (Cir. Rule 42-1) Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to file opening brief. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. [11948912] (OC) [Entered: 12/30/2020 02:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#14) Streamlined request [13] by Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Michael Geary Wilson opening brief due 11/25/2020. Appellees Natalie Brown, County of Contra Costa, County of Santa Clara, Bradley Davis, Shawn Francis, James Helms, Jay T. Jambeck, John Muir Health, Calvin Knight, Maria Margarite Lampasona, Mandy Gina Leigh, Leigh Law Group, P.C., Kevin Randall Mintz, Mario Perez, Rankin, Shuey, Ranucci, Mintz, Lampasona & Reynolds, A Professional Corporation, John William Ranucci, Michael Rene Reynolds, David Todd Shuey, Laurie Smith and Damien Troutman answering brief due 12/28/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11859362] (BG) [Entered: 10/15/2020 07:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson. New requested due date is 11/25/2020. [11859186] [20-16630] (Wilson, Michael) [Entered: 10/14/2020 05:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DA): Appellants motions to consolidate (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 6 ],[ # 7 ]) are denied. The briefing schedule established on August 24, 2020 remains in effect for this appeal No. 20-16630. [11839635] (WL) [Entered: 09/28/2020 03:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson Correspondence: WILSONS NOTICE RE THIS COURTS SUPERVISORY MANDAMUS JURISDICTION IN 20-16467, 20-16470, 20-16521, 20-16523, 20-16525, 20-16531, 20-16536, 20-16537, 20-16630, 20-16674, 20-16738, and 20-16782. Date of service: 09/18/2020 [11829226] [20-16630] (Wilson, Michael) [Entered: 09/18/2020 12:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#10) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/17/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11828499]. [20-16630] (AD) [Entered: 09/17/2020 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/17/2020. [11828486] [20-16630] (Wilson, Michael) [Entered: 09/17/2020 06:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson Correspondence: WILSONS 9/17/2020 CERTIFICATE THAT NO TRANSCRIPT WILL BE ORDERED. Date of service: 09/17/2020 [11828485] [20-16630] (Wilson, Michael) [Entered: 09/17/2020 06:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson Amended Motion to consolidate cases 20-16467, 20-16470, 20-16521, 20-16523, 20-16525, 20-16531, 20-16536, 20-16537, 20-16630, 20-16674, 20-16738, 20-16782. Date of service: 09/16/2020. [11826440] [20-16630] (Wilson, Michael) [Entered: 09/16/2020 01:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson Amended Motion to consolidate cases 20-16467, 20-16470, 20-16521, 20-16523, 20-16525, 20-16531, 20-16536, 20-16537, 20-16630, 20-16674, 20-16738. Date of service: 09/15/2020. [11825479] [20-16630] (Wilson, Michael) [Entered: 09/15/2020 08:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Received copy of District Court order filed on 09/08/2020. Granting IFP status on appeal. [11818322] (RR) [Entered: 09/09/2020 07:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11804860] (CKP) [Entered: 08/27/2020 11:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#3) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 20-16630: IFP] ). [11802049] (CO) [Entered: 08/25/2020 01:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Michael Geary Wilson Correspondence: WILSONS 8/25/2020 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR RE FEES. Date of service: 08/25/2020 [11801410] [20-16630] (Wilson, Michael) [Entered: 08/25/2020 09:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Michael Geary Wilson opening brief due 10/26/2020. Appellees Natalie Brown, County of Contra Costa, County of Santa Clara, Bradley Davis, Shawn Francis, James Helms, Jay T. Jambeck, John Muir Health, Calvin Knight, Maria Margarite Lampasona, Mandy Gina Leigh, Leigh Law Group, P.C., Kevin Randall Mintz, Mario Perez, Rankin, Shuey, Ranucci, Mintz, Lampasona & Reynolds, A Professional Corporation, John William Ranucci, Michael Rene Reynolds, David Todd Shuey, Laurie Smith and Damien Troutman answering brief due 11/27/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11800387] (RT) [Entered: 08/24/2020 02:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less