This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/23/2020 at 06:06:03 (UTC).

Michael White, et al v. Illinois State Police, et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Michael White filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Illinois State Police. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2842

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

MICHAEL WHITE

ILLINOIS STATE RIFLE ASSOCIATION

Defendant / Appellees

ILLINOIS CONCEALED CARRY LICENSING REVIEW BOARD

JEREMY MARGOLIS, as Chair of the Illinois Concealed Carry Licensing Review Board

ILLINOIS STATE POLICE

JESSICA TRAME, in her official capacity as Bureau Chief of the Illinois State Police Firearms Services Bureau

BRENDAN KELLY, in his official capacity as Acting Director of the Illinois State Police

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Gregory Abbott Bedell

Attorney at KNABE, KRONING & BEDELL

20 S. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60603

David G. Sigale

Attorney at LAW FIRM OF DAVID G. SIGALE, P.C.

430 W. Roosevelt Road

Wheaton, IL 60187

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nadine J. Wichern

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

100 W. Randolph Street, State Of Illinois Center

Chicago, IL 60601-0000

Sarah A. Hunger

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

100 W. Randolph Street, State Of Illinois Center

Chicago, IL 60601-3218

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 8 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 11/23/2020 for Illinois State Rifle Association and Michael White. Appellee's brief due on or before 12/23/2020 for Illinois Concealed Carry Licensing Review Board, Illinois State Police, Brendan Kelly, Jeremy Margolis and Jessica Trame. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/13/2021 for Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Michael White CMD [9] [7117417] [20-2842] (FP) [Entered: 10/26/2020 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion filed by Appellants Michael White and Illinois State Rifle Association to extend time to file appellant brief. [8] [7117335] [20-2842] (Bedell, Gregory) [Entered: 10/26/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Nadine J. Wichern for Jessica Trame, Jeremy Margolis, Brendan Kelly, Illinois State Police and Illinois Concealed Carry Licensing Review Board in 20-2842 terminated and added Attorney(s) Sarah A. Hunger for party(s) Appellee Jeremy Margolis Appellee Illinois Concealed Carry Licensing Review Board Appellee Illinois State Police Appellee Brendan Kelly Appellee Jessica Trame, in case 20-2842 per appearance form. Appearance form filed by Attorney Sarah A. Hunger for Appellees Illinois Concealed Carry Licensing Review Board, Illinois State Police, Brendan Kelly, Jeremy Margolis and Jessica Trame. Additional Parties: Edward Bobrick, Stephen Dinwiddie, Joseph Duffy, Jon Johnson, Joseph Vaughn, and Frank Wright. [7] [7112088] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-2842]--[Edited 10/02/2020 by AD to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Hunger, Sarah) [Entered: 10/01/2020 06:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David G. Sigale for Appellee Illinois Concealed Carry Licensing Review Board Appellant Illinois State Rifle Association and Appellant Michael White. [6] [7111555] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2842]--[Edited 09/30/2020 by CG to reflect correct party representation and the addition of counsel.] (Sigale, David) [Entered: 09/30/2020 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Michael White and Illinois State Rifle Association. [5] [7111511] [20-2842] (Bedell, Gregory) [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Michael White and Illinois State Rifle Association. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. White v Illinois Department of State Police, et al., docketed in the Circuit Court of Cook County as 14 CH 17205, and ruled upon by the Illinois Appellate Court, First District, in 2017 (2017 IL App (1st) 161282-U). [4] [7111510] [20-2842] (Bedell, Gregory) [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Gregory A. Bedell for Appellants Michael White and Illinois State Rifle Association. [3] [7111507] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2842] (Bedell, Gregory) [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: EDWARD BOBRICK, STEPHEN DINWIDDIE, JOSEPH DUFFY,JON JOHNSON, JOSEPH VAUGHN and FRANK WRIGHT. [2] [7110193] [20-2842] (AG) [Entered: 09/24/2020 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Michael White by 09/30/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 10/08/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 11/03/2020 for Illinois State Rifle Association and Michael White. [1] [7110191] [20-2842] (AG) [Entered: 09/24/2020 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Illinois State Rifle Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Illinois State Police Master Sergeant is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah A. Hunger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nadine J. Wichern