This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/18/2021 at 06:09:15 (UTC).

Michael Vogt v. State Farm Life Insurance Comp

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 Michael Vogt filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Life Insurance Comp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1370

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

State Farm Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff / Appellee

Michael G. Vogt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Bradley J. Andreozzi

Attorney at FAEGRE & DRINKER

Suite 3700, 191 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-1698

William L. Greene

Attorney at STINSON, LLP

Suite 2600, 50 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jeremy Root

Attorney at STINSON LLP

230 W. Mccarty Street

Jefferson City, MO 65101

Todd Noteboom

Attorney at STINSON, LLP

Suite 2600, 50 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Wayne B. Mason

Attorney at DRINKER & BIDDLE

Sutie 5400, 1717 Main Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Kristin Andrea Linsley

Attorney at GIBSON & DUNN

Suite 3000, 555 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-0921

Charles W. Hatfield

Attorney at STINSON LLP

230 W. Mccarty Street

Jefferson City, MO 65101

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Lindsay Todd Perkins

Attorney at STUEVE & SIEGEL

Suite 200, 460 Nichols Road

Kansas City, MO 64112

Ethan M. Lange

Attorney at STUEVE & SIEGEL

Suite 200, 460 Nichols Road

Kansas City, MO 64112

Joseph M. Feierabend

Attorney at MILLER & SCHIRGER

Suite 1570, 4520 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64111

John J. Schirger

Attorney at MILLER & SCHIRGER

Suite 1570, 4520 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64111

Norman Siegel

Attorney at STUEVE & SIEGEL

Suite 200, 460 Nichols Road

Kansas City, MO 64112

Bradley Wilders

Attorney at STUEVE & SIEGEL

Suite 200, 460 Nichols Road

Kansas City, MO 64112

Patrick Joseph Stueve

Attorney at STUEVE & SIEGEL

Suite 200, 460 Nichols Road

Kansas City, MO 64112

Matthew W. Lytle

Attorney at MILLER & SCHIRGER

Suite 1570, 4520 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64111

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Cover Letter

Open Document #2

Court Order

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY brief of State Farm Life Insurance Company in 20-3481, 21-1370 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5013209] [20-3481, 21-1370] (JR) [Entered: 03/10/2021 11:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPlease note that this case has been screened for oral argument. The exact date of your oral argument has not been determined at this time. You will be receiving a calendar approximately 4 weeks before the scheduled argument date. Please review the current and future argument dates immediately to determine if you have any conflicts. # Click Here to View Published Argument Calendars and Future Court Session Dates and Locations If you do have conflicts with any of the argument dates, please inform this court by sending a letter using the ECF docketing event 'Correspondence to Court', 'Letter filed' 'regarding availability for oral argument'. Your compliance with this policy will minimize the need for motions to continue or reschedule oral argument. The court also encourages you to notify the clerk if conflicts with these dates develop in the future. The clerk's office takes conflict dates into consideration in scheduling oral arguments but cannot guarantee that every request will be honored. [5009531] [20-3481, 21-1370] (JMM) [Entered: 03/01/2021 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Jeremy A. Root for Appellant State Farm Life Insurance Company w/service 02/22/2021 [5006821] [21-1370] (JR) [Entered: 02/22/2021 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Todd A. Noteboom for Appellant State Farm Life Insurance Company w/service 02/22/2021 [5006764] [21-1370] (TN) [Entered: 02/22/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Joseph M Feierabend for Appellee Mr. Michael G. Vogt w/service 02/22/2021 [5006575] [21-1370] (JMF) [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Matthew W Lytle for Appellee Mr. Michael G. Vogt w/service 02/22/2021 [5006569] [21-1370] (MWL) [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by John J Schirger for Appellee Mr. Michael G. Vogt w/service 02/22/2021 [5006567] [21-1370] (JJS) [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Norman E. Siegel for Appellee Mr. Michael G. Vogt w/service 02/22/2021 [5006565] [21-1370] (NS) [Entered: 02/22/2021 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Ethan M. Lange for Appellee Mr. Michael G. Vogt w/service 02/19/2021 [5006451] [21-1370] (EML) [Entered: 02/19/2021 07:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Bradley T. Wilders for Appellee Mr. Michael G. Vogt w/service 02/19/2021 [5006450] [21-1370] (BW) [Entered: 02/19/2021 07:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Lindsay Todd Perkins for Appellee Mr. Michael G. Vogt w/service 02/19/2021 [5006362] [21-1370] (LTP) [Entered: 02/19/2021 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: regarding the consolidation of case 20-3481 with case 21-1370. A new briefing schedule will not be entered. The briefing schedule in the 20-3481 will continue as the consolidated briefing schedule. [5005429] [20-3481, 21-1370] (AEV) [Entered: 02/17/2021 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 11/17/20, Amended Judgment 1/25/21, docket entries, [5005420] [21-1370] (AEV) [Entered: 02/17/2021 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5005415] [21-1370] (AEV) [Entered: 02/17/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Norman Siegel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ethan Michael Lange