This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/31/2020 at 06:01:54 (UTC).

Michael Thulen, Jr., et al v. American Federation of State C, et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Michael Thulen, Jr filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against American Federation of State C. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1186

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff

MICHAEL PORTER

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

TOWNSHIP OF LAKEWOOD

JOHN BONANNI

PHIL MURPHY, in his official capacity as Governor of New Jersey

PAUL BOUDREAU

PAULA B. VOOS

DAVID JONES, in their official capacities as members of the New Jersey Public Employment Relations Commission

GURBIR GREWAL, in his official capacity as Attorney General of New Jersey

JOEL M. WEISBLATT

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES AFL-CIO LOCAL 3790

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES AFL CIO

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES NEW JERSEY COUNCIL 63

Plaintiff / Appellants

TERENCE GAUDLIP

MICHAEL THULEN, JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant, Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew C. Moench Esq.

Attorney at King Moench Hirnial & Metha

51 Gibraltar Drive, Suite 2F

Morris Plains, NJ 07950

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Paul L. Kleinbaum Esq.

Attorney at Zazzali Fagella Nowak Kleinbaum & Friedman

570 Broad Street, Suite 1402

Newark, NJ 07102

Christine R. Lucarelli Esq.

Attorney at Public Employment Relations Commission

495 West State Street, P.O. Box 429

Trenton, NJ 08625

Lauren A. Jensen Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, P.O. Box 112

Trenton, NJ 08625

Jana R. DiCosmo Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

Division Of Law, Richard J. Hughes Justice Complex, 25 Market Street, P.O. Box 112

Trenton, NJ 08625

Leon Dayan Esq.

Attorney at Bredhoff & Kaiser

805 15Th Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Ramya Ravindran Esq.

Attorney at Bredhoff & Kaiser

805 15Th Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#14

13 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

13 #1

Standing Order

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Caption

1 #3

DC Order

1 #2

DC Opinion

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting unopposed motion filed by Appellants Michael Thulen, Jr. and Terence Gaudlip for extension of time to file brief and appendix until April 30, 2020. (ARR) [Entered: 03/20/2020 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Terence Gaudlip and Michael Thulen, Jr. for Extension of Time to file Appellants' Merits Brief and Joint Appendix until/for 31 days to April 30, 2020. Certificate of Service dated 03/19/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-1186] (MCM) [Entered: 03/19/2020 06:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Terence Gaudlip and Michael Thulen Jr. due on or before 03/30/2020. Appendix due on or before 03/30/2020. (MB) [Entered: 02/18/2020 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lauren A. Jensen on behalf of Appellee(s) Phil Murphy, in his official capacity as Governor of New Jersey, and Gurbir Grewal, in his official capacity as Attorney General of New Jersey. [20-1186] (LAJ) [Entered: 02/14/2020 05:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Terence Gaudlip and Michael Thulen, Jr.. [20-1186] (MCM) [Entered: 02/14/2020 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Michael Thulen, Jr. and Terence Gaudlip. [20-1186] (MCM) [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Terence Gaudlip and Michael Thulen, Jr. advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-1186] (MCM) [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew C. Moench on behalf of Appellant(s) Michael Thulen, Jr., Terence Gaudlip. [20-1186] (MCM) [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees AFSCME, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees AFL-CIO Local 3790 and American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees New Jersey Council 63. [20-1186] (RR) [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ramya Ravindran on behalf of Appellee(s) American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees New Jersey Council 63, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees AFL-CIO, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees AFL-CIO Local 3790. [20-1186] (RR) [Entered: 02/10/2020 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Leon Dayan on behalf of Appellee(s) American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees New Jersey Council 63, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees AFL-CIO, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees AFL-CIO Local 3790. [20-1186] (LD) [Entered: 02/10/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Paul L. Kleinbaum on behalf of Appellee(s) American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, New Jersey Council 63; American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO; American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Local 3790. [20-1186] (PLK) [Entered: 02/06/2020 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christine Lucarelli on behalf of Appellee(s) Joel W. Weisblatt, Chair; Paul Boudreau; Paula B. Voos; John Bonnani and David Jones, Members of NJ PERC. [20-1186] (CRL) [Entered: 01/31/2020 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MB) [Entered: 01/31/2020 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Terence Gaudlip and Michael Thulen, Jr. in District Court No. 1-18-cv-14584. (MB) [Entered: 01/31/2020 08:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOWNSHIP OF LAKEWOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES LOCAL 619 DISTRICT COUNCIL 36 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER MOENCH