This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2020 at 06:01:43 (UTC).

Michael Singleton v. Warden Lackawanna County Priso

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Michael Singleton filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden Lackawanna County Priso. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3161

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

WARDEN LACKAWANNA COUNTY PRISON

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHAEL A. SINGLETON

Scranton, PA 18509

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael A. Singleton

Attorney at Lackawanna County Prison

1371 North Washington Avenue

Scranton, PA 18509

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER (Clerk) granting Appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal of the appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (CJG) [Entered: 11/04/2020 12:47 PM]

#4

(#4) LETTER MOTION filed by Appellant Michael A. Singleton Requesting Voluntary Dismissal Appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (CJG) [Entered: 11/04/2020 12:46 PM]

#3

(#3) LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (MW) [Entered: 10/27/2020 01:57 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Letter

1 #3

Case Caption

1 #2

District Court Order 4/7/20

#1

Civil Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER (Clerk) granting Appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal of the appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (CJG) [Entered: 11/04/2020 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER MOTION filed by Appellant Michael A. Singleton Requesting Voluntary Dismissal Appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (CJG) [Entered: 11/04/2020 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (MW) [Entered: 10/27/2020 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 10/22/2020 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Michael A. Singleton in District Court No. 3-19-cv-01426. (CJG) [Entered: 10/22/2020 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less