This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/26/2021 at 06:09:55 (UTC).

Michael Sanders v. Trinity Services Group Incorpo, et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Michael Sanders filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Trinity Services Group Incorpo. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15333

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CHRIS MOODY

DAVID SHINN, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections

DE LEON

CHARLES L. RYAN, in his individual capacity

SILVAS

E. SANCHEZ

LAURA DONNELLY

JOHN DOE, TSG's Manager

RAMIREZ

JANE DOE, TSG's Kitchen Manager

TRINITY SERVICES GROUP INCORPORATED

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHAEL MARTIN SANDERS

Buckeye, AZ 85326

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Neil Singh

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Bradley Dunn

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson

2375 E. Camelback Road, Suite 750

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Tabitha Marjorie Bono Esquire

Attorney at Ameren Services

1901 Chouteau Avenue, Mc 1320

St. Louis, MO 63103

Randy Aoyama

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson

2375 E. Camelback Road, Suite 750

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael Martin Sanders

Attorney at ASPC - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX - LEWIS

P.O. Box 3200

Buckeye, AZ 85326

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#2

#3

4 #1

Main Document

4 #2

Prisoner Fee Authorization

#5

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Motion [ # 7 ] to extend time to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Michael Martin Sanders; Appellant Michael Martin Sanders opening brief due 05/26/2021. Appellees De Leon, Jane Doe, John Doe, Laura Donnelly, Silvas, Chris Moody, Ramirez, Charles L. Ryan, E. Sanchez, David Shinn, Director and Trinity Services Group Incorporated answering brief due 06/25/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12080543] (GS) [Entered: 04/20/2021 10:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed Appellant Michael Martin Sanders motion to extend time to file appellant opening brief until 05/16/2021. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/20/2021. [12080400] (DJV) [Entered: 04/20/2021 10:14 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docket(#6) Sent Appellant a copy of the docket sheet and the FRAP and Ninth Circuit rules in response to his request filed on 03/17/2021. [12047543] (JR) [Entered: 03/19/2021 12:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed Appellant Michael Martin Sanders letter dated re: request circuit rules and docket sheet copy. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12044244] (JFF) [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [12032651] (CKP) [Entered: 03/11/2021 02:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 03/10/2021. [Case Number 21-15333: Partially Paid] [12032096] (JFF) [Entered: 03/11/2021 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12019717] (CKP) [Entered: 03/01/2021 11:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Michael Martin Sanders opening brief due 04/26/2021. Appellees Trinity Services Group Incorporated et al. answering brief due 05/25/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12016517] (JPD) [Entered: 02/25/2021 10:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAVID SHINN, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases where Silva As Trustee, Rosa M is a litigant

Latest cases where TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RAMIREZ is a litigant