Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2019 at 06:11:15 (UTC).

Michael Samuels v. Secretary, Department of Corr.

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 Michael Samuels filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-13445

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

MICHAEL SAMUELS

South Bay, FL 33493

Respondent / Appellee

SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Michael Samuels

Attorney at South Bay CF - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 7171

South Bay, FL 33493

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Lindsay Warner

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

1515 N Flagler Dr Ste 900

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Ashley Moody

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

1515 N Flagler Dr Ste 900

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Public Communication: Letter to appellant advising his motions for appointment of counsel are currently pending before the court. [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:29 PM]

Open Document

RENEWED MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Michael Samuels. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8915552-1] [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:28 PM]

Open Document #2

Motion or Document Returned Unfiled

Open Document #1

PRO-3 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Amended Motion to expand certificate of appealability [ # 8891589-2 ] filed by Appellant Michael Samuels. [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:58 PM]

Open Document

The briefing schedule issued to Appellant Michael Samuels is hereby rescinded for the following reason(s): Pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 31-1(b), a motion for appointment of counsel stays the briefing schedule. When the above matter is resolved, the clerk will issue a notice advising counsel and the parties of the new schedule for filing briefs in this appeal. [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:52 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Michael Samuels. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8894474-1] [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:50 AM]

Open Document #2

MOT-9 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Motion to expand coa

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Michael Samuels. [Entered: 09/24/2019 02:50 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Michael Samuels. No hearings. [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:43 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Lindsay Warner for Appellee Secretary, Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13445] (ECF: Lindsay Warner) [Entered: 09/18/2019 08:53 AM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Michael Samuels. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/21/2019. [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:38 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lindsay Warner for Secretary, Department of Corrections. [19-13445] (ECF: Lindsay Warner) [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:25 AM]

Open Document

USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Michael Samuels was filed on 09/06/2019. Docket Entry 26. [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:56 AM]

Open Document

USDC final judgment and order denying petition and granting, in part, certirficate of appealability as to Appellant Michael Samuels was filed on 08/19/2019. Docket Entry 20. [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:59 AM]

Open Document #4

DKT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

DC Order DE #20

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Public Communication: Letter to appellant advising his motions for appointment of counsel are currently pending before the court. [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RENEWED MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Michael Samuels. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8915552-1] [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED UNFILED: Motion for Extension filed by Michael Samuels is returned unfiled. Pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 31-1(b) a motion for appointment of counsel and a motion to expand COA stays the briefing schedule. [Entered: 10/10/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Motion to expand certificate of appealability [ # 8891589-2 ] filed by Appellant Michael Samuels. [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • The briefing schedule issued to Appellant Michael Samuels is hereby rescinded for the following reason(s): Pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 31-1(b), a motion for appointment of counsel stays the briefing schedule. When the above matter is resolved, the clerk will issue a notice advising counsel and the parties of the new schedule for filing briefs in this appeal. [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Michael Samuels. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8894474-1] [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to expand the certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Michael Samuels. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8891589-1] [Entered: 09/26/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Michael Samuels. [Entered: 09/24/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Michael Samuels. No hearings. [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Lindsay Warner for Appellee Secretary, Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13445] (ECF: Lindsay Warner) [Entered: 09/18/2019 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Michael Samuels. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/21/2019. [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lindsay Warner for Secretary, Department of Corrections. [19-13445] (ECF: Lindsay Warner) [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Michael Samuels was filed on 09/06/2019. Docket Entry 26. [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC final judgment and order denying petition and granting, in part, certirficate of appealability as to Appellant Michael Samuels was filed on 08/19/2019. Docket Entry 20. [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Michael Samuels on 09/04/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary, Department of Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashley Moody